Global Patent Index - EP 1101912 A2

EP 1101912 A2 2001-05-23 - Silencer comprising external and internal half shells

Title (en)

Silencer comprising external and internal half shells

Title (de)

Schalldämpfer mit Aussen- und Innenhalbschalen

Title (fr)

Silencieux composé de demi-coquilles externes et internes

Publication

EP 1101912 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 01103995 A

Priority

  • DE 19627299 A
  • EP 97111003 A

Abstract (en)

The vehicle exhaust silencer (1) is composed of two outer shells (2,3) and two inner shells (4,5) to take the pressed exhaust gas pipe. A welded gas inflow and outflow are at the edge of the shells (2-5). The shell edges are folded over so that only the edge (14) of the inner half-shell (4) is bent directly into the single-stage peripheral fold (9). The edge (15) of the other inner half-shell (5) is clamped within the peripheral fold (9). The peripheral fold (9) is bent downwards.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Schalldämpfer (1) mit zwei Außenhalbschalen (2, 3) und zwei Innenhalbschalen (4, 5), in welchen eine Abgasführung (6) eingeprägt bzw. eingepreßt ist, sowie einem am Rand der Schalen (2, 3, 4, 5) verschweißten Abgaseintritt (7) und Abgasaustritt (8), und einem abgewinkelten Umfangsfalz (9), wird vorgeschlagen, nur den Rand (14) der einen Innenhalbschale (4) unmittelbar im einstufigen Umfangsfalz (9) der Außenhalbschalen (2, 3) gebogen aufzunehmen und den Rand (15) der anderen Innenhalbschale (5) im Umfangsfalz (9) einzuklemmen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01N 7/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01N 13/18 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01N 13/1872 (2013.01); F01N 13/185 (2013.01); F01N 13/1888 (2013.01); F01N 2450/24 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0816650 A1 19980107; EP 0816650 B1 20011205; DE 19627299 A1 19980108; DE 59712413 D1 20051006; EP 1101912 A2 20010523; EP 1101912 A3 20031119; EP 1101912 B1 20050831

INPADOC legal status


2014-05-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130702

2014-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130731

2014-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130702

2014-04-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140331

2014-03-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130702

2013-05-16 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59712413

- Effective date: 20130201

2013-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130201

2012-12-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120803

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120724

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120723

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110731

- Year of fee payment: 15

2006-08-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060601

2006-04-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-10-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20051005

2005-10-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59712413 P 20051006

2005-08-31 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 0816650 P

2005-08-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2005-08-31 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-08-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-07-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040614

2004-07-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040519

2003-11-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-05-23 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 816650

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT