Global Patent Index - EP 1101918 A2

EP 1101918 A2 2001-05-23 - Generator drive

Title (en)

Generator drive

Title (de)

Antrieb für einen Generator

Title (fr)

Entrainement generateur

Publication

EP 1101918 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00124415 A

Priority

DE 19955068 A

Abstract (en)

The drive (1) has a drive element (3), e.g. the crankshaft (4) of an IC engine (5), coupled to the electrical generator (2) via a continuously variable rev conversion unit (6), e.g. a viscosity clutch (11) with a variable slip between the driving and driven clutch elements (9,10), for providing a constant output revs. The regulation of the rev conversion unit can be provided mechanically, electrically and/or hydraulically.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Antrieb für einen Generator eines Kraftfahrzeugs, mit einem Antriebselement für den Generator. Der Antrieb zeichnet sich dadurch aus, dass zwischen dem Antriebselement (3) und dem Generator (2) eine stufenlos verstellbare Drehzahlübersetzungseinheit (6) angeordnet ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02B 63/04; F02B 67/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02B 63/04 (2006.01); F02B 67/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02B 63/04 (2013.01); F02B 67/00 (2013.01); F02B 63/042 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1101918 A2 20010523; EP 1101918 A3 20020306; DE 19955068 A1 20010523

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040602

2002-11-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2002-11-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020906

2002-03-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-03-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI