Global Patent Index - EP 1101922 A2

EP 1101922 A2 2001-05-23 - Cylinder head for use in an internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Cylinder head for use in an internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Zylinderkopf für eine Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Culasse pour un moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 1101922 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00123126 A

Priority

JP 33114099 A

Abstract (en)

In a cylinder head 1 has boss portions 8 for head bolts 11 which are formed inside of both sides of the cylinder head 1, and a discharge/intake port 5 which extends from an intermediate portion 15a of a lower-surface deck 15 that is in contact with a gasket 9. In this cylinder head 1, ribs 16 are connected and supported from an upper portion 8a of the boss portions 8 toward a lower portion 5a of the intake port 5. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02F 1/38; F02F 1/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02F 1/38 (2006.01); F02F 1/42 (2006.01); F02F 1/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02F 1/4285 (2013.01); F02F 1/38 (2013.01); F02F 2001/247 (2013.01); F02F 2007/0063 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1101922 A2 20010523; EP 1101922 A3 20020502

INPADOC legal status


2003-11-05 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021031

2003-01-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR IT

2002-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-12-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI

2001-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001025

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI