Global Patent Index - EP 1101931 A2

EP 1101931 A2 2001-05-23 - High pressure common rail injection system

Title (en)

High pressure common rail injection system

Title (de)

Hochdruckeinspritzsystem mit Common Rail

Title (fr)

Système d'injection à haute pression avec common rail

Publication

EP 1101931 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00122678 A

Priority

CH 212299 A

Abstract (en)

The injection system includes a high pressure line element (10) in the form of a common rail with a high pressure sealing surface, lying against the second endface (35) of the channel element (30), which is also a high pressure sealing surface. The channel element is between the plunger cylinder (21) and the common rail.

Abstract (de)

Das erfindungsgemässe Hochdruckeinspritzsystem (1) weist ein mit wenigstens einem Auslasskanal (32) versehenes Kanalelement (30) mit einander gegenüberliegenden Stirnseiten (34; 35) auf, an die über Hochdruck-Dichtflächen einerseits ein Plungerzylinder (21) einer Hochdruckpumpe (20) und andererseits ein Common Rail (10) angeschlossen sind, so dass die Hochdruckpumpe (20) über ein Eintrittsventil (33) ein Fördermedium ansaugen und mit erhöhtem Druck durch den Auslasskanal (32) des Kanalelements (30) und ein Austrittsventil (17) über einen Abflusskanal (14) in den im Common Rail (10) vorgesehenen .Druckraum (11) einführen kann. Vorzugsweise wird ein Common Rail (10) eingesetzt, innerhalb dem dem Transport des Fördermediums dienende Zufluss- und Abflusskanäle (13; 14) vorgesehen sind, die über Anformungen (15) am Common Rail (10) mit einer Hochdruckpumpe (20) verbindbar sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 39/02; F02M 55/02; F02M 59/44; F02M 63/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 39/02 (2006.01); F02M 47/00 (2006.01); F02M 47/02 (2006.01); F02M 55/02 (2006.01); F02M 59/44 (2006.01); F02M 63/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 63/0225 (2013.01); F02M 39/02 (2013.01); F02M 55/025 (2013.01); F02M 59/44 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1101931 A2 20010523; EP 1101931 A3 20040428; EP 1101931 B1 20060830; DE 50013384 D1 20061012; JP 2001173537 A 20010626; JP 3737355 B2 20060118; US 2002017278 A1 20020214; US 6330876 B1 20011218; US 6745753 B2 20040608

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161024

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161020

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161020

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161020

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2007-08-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070531

2007-03-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-12-11 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061211

2006-12-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20061115

2006-10-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50013384 P 20061012

2006-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2006-08-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-08-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060830

2005-06-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050418

2005-01-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-10-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040805

2004-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-04-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-04-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02M 39/02 A

2004-04-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02M 55/02 B

2004-04-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02M 59/44 B

2004-04-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02M 63/02 B

2004-01-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02M 55/02 A

2004-01-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02M 39/02 B

2004-01-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02M 59/44 B

2004-01-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02M 63/02 B

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI