Global Patent Index - EP 1101932 A1

EP 1101932 A1 2001-05-23 - Starter for internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Starter for internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Starter für eine Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Démarreur pour moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 1101932 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00124575 A

Priority

DE 19955065 A

Abstract (en)

The electronic assembly (3) is located inside the casing (1) of the electrical starter motor (2).

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Starter für eine Brennkraftmaschine, mit einem Startergehäuse (1), mit einem in dem Startergehäuse (1) untergebrachten elektrischen Startermotor (2), mit zumindest einem Sensor zur Erfassung von zumindest einem Starter-Betriebsparameter, und mit einer den Sensor umfassenden elektronischen Baugruppe (3), die Bestandteile einer Regel- und/oder Steuerschaltung ist, die den elektrischen Startermotor (2) und/oder andere Starterbestandteile regelt und/oder steuert. Es ist vorgesehen, daß die elektronische Baugruppe (3) innerhalb des Startergehäuses (1) angeordnet ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02N 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02N 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02N 11/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1101932 A1 20010523; EP 1101932 B1 20060215; DE 19955065 A1 20010523; DE 50012224 D1 20060420; ES 2255938 T3 20060716

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170126

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141111

2015-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141110

2015-12-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20151229

2015-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141201

2015-10-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141110

2015-08-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150731

2015-07-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20141110

2014-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20131125

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20131120

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20131119

- Year of fee payment: 14

2014-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20131122

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-01-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20061116

2006-10-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2255938 T3

2006-06-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060524

2006-04-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50012224 P 20060420

2006-02-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2006-02-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-02-15 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060215

2004-09-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040812

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2002-01-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011123

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2001-05-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI