Global Patent Index - EP 1101938 A1

EP 1101938 A1 2001-05-23 - Closed electron drift plasma thrustor with orientable thrust vector

Title (en)

Closed electron drift plasma thrustor with orientable thrust vector

Title (de)

Plasmaschubantrieb mit geschlossener Elektronenbahn und einstellbarem Schubvektor

Title (fr)

Propulseur à plasma à dérivée fermée d'électrons à vecteur poussée orientable

Publication

EP 1101938 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99403313 A

Priority

FR 9816631 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2788084A1] The propulsion unit comprises of cathodes (140) arranged on non-parallel axis (241a,241b) within a main coil assembly (131). An ionizing gas is introduced into the annulus between the coil assemblies. The coils generate an electromagnetic field such that the direction and the vector magnitude of the ionizing plasma jet can be controlled.

Abstract (fr)

Le propulseur comprend sur une même platine plusieurs canaux annulaires principaux d'ionisation et d'accélération (124A, 124B) présentant des axes non parallèles (241A, 241B) qui convergent du côté de la sortie des canaux (124A, 124B). Un circuit magnétique (131, 134, 136, 311) assure la création d'un champ magnétique dans les canaux annulaires (124A, 124B). Le propulseur comprend en outre une cathode creuse (140), des moyens pour réguler le débit d'alimentation en gaz ionisable de chaque canal annulaire (124A, 124B) et des moyens de contrôle du courant de décharge et d'accélération des ions dans les canaux (124A, 124B). Le contrôle de l'orientation du vecteur poussée du propulseur peut être effectué sans augmenter de façon sensible la masse du propulseur. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F03H 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F03H 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F03H 1/0075 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2788084 A1 20000707; FR 2788084 B1 20010406; DE 69934122 D1 20070104; DE 69934122 T2 20070920; EP 1101938 A1 20010523; EP 1101938 B1 20061122; JP 2000205115 A 20000725; JP 4377016 B2 20091202; RU 2227845 C2 20040427; US 6279314 B1 20010828

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20171120

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171121

- Year of fee payment: 19

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171120

- Year of fee payment: 19

2012-11-29 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SNECMA, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SOCIETE NATIONALE D'ETUDE ET DE CONSTRUCTION DE MOTEURS D'AVIATION (S.N.E.C.M.A.), PARIS, FR

- Document: DE 69934122

- Effective date: 20121005

2012-11-29 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69934122

- Representative's name: CBDL PATENTANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20121005

2012-10-05 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69934122

- Representative's name: CBDL PATENTANWAELTE, DE

2012-06-13 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20120517 AND 20120523

2007-10-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070823

2007-03-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20070208

2007-01-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69934122 P 20070104

2006-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2006-11-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE GB IT

2001-12-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011025

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2001-05-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI