Global Patent Index - EP 1101952 A2

EP 1101952 A2 2001-05-23 - Fluid-operated cylinder-piston unit

Title (en)

Fluid-operated cylinder-piston unit

Title (de)

Druckmittelangetriebene Kolben-Zylindervorrichtung

Title (fr)

Unité de vérin

Publication

EP 1101952 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00203870 A

Priority

IT RE990118 A

Abstract (en)

The cylinder-piston unit comprises a headpiece, within the body (25) of which there are provided: a pressurized fluid inlet (23) to be connected to the feed; a fluid outlet (24); at least one conduit (21) communicating with the first operating chamber; between the inlet (23) and the conduit (21), a first passage (A) having in a lateral face of the body (25) two spaced-apart ports (31a, 32a), one communicating with the inlet (23) and the other with the conduit (21); and finally, between the outlet (24) and the conduit (21), a second passage (B) having in a lateral face of the body (25) two spaced-apart ports (31b, 32b), one communicating with the outlet (24) and the other with the conduit (21). In each of said passages (A, B) there is provided a valve for opening or closing the fluid passage, comprising a lateral chamber (35) covering said communication ports (31, 32) and formed in a cover (27d, 27s) positioned on the lateral face of the body of the headpiece, and a free flexible membrane (36) separating said ports (31, 32) from the lateral chamber (35) and being arranged to assume a first position in said ports (31, 32) are closed and a second position in which they are open; thin pilot channels (51, 52) are provided to feed into the lateral chamber (35) a pilot fluid to urge the membrane (36) into the first position for closing the ports (31, 32), against the thrust of the fluid present in the ports; a pilot valve means (40) is also provided communicating with the fluid feed, to distribute, when commanded, pressurized pilot fluid to the lateral chambers (35) via said pilot channels (51, 52), to open the first passage (A) and close the second (B) and vice versa. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F15B 15/20; F15B 13/04; F15B 13/043

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F15B 13/04 (2006.01); F15B 13/043 (2006.01); F15B 15/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 15/202 (2013.01); F15B 13/0405 (2013.01); F15B 13/043 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1101952 A2 20010523; EP 1101952 A3 20030813; IT 1311049 B1 20020228; IT RE990118 A1 20010517; IT RE990118 D0 19991117

INPADOC legal status


2004-11-03 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040214

2004-06-09 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-05-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-08-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-08-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI