Global Patent Index - EP 1102007 A2

EP 1102007 A2 2001-05-23 - Glow-plug

Title (en)

Glow-plug

Title (de)

Glühkerze

Title (fr)

Bougie à incandescence

Publication

EP 1102007 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00125132 A

Priority

  • JP 32847999 A
  • JP 2000229008 A
  • JP 2000306671 A

Abstract (en)

In a glow plug, a metal heater case (20) has at one end thereof a smaller diameter portion (22) whose diameter is not larger than 4 mm and whose length is not shorter than 15 mm and has at the other end thereof a larger diameter portion (24). A first coil (30) is embedded via insulation powder (26) in the smaller diameter portion of the heater case and one end thereof is electrically conducted with the heater case. A second coil (40) is embedded via insulation powder (26) in and insulated with the heater case and one end thereof is connected to the other end of the first coil. A housing (10) holds the heater case by enveloping a part of the larger diameter portion of the heater case. A portion of the heater case corresponding to the first coil shows highest temperature in the heater case in 60 seconds after rated voltage is applied to the first and second coils. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23Q 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02P 19/00 (2006.01); F23Q 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23Q 7/001 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0834699 A2 19980408 - DENSO CORP [JP]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1102007 A2 20010523; EP 1102007 A3 20050831; EP 1102007 B1 20080730; DE 60039671 D1 20080911; JP 2002106843 A 20020410

INPADOC legal status


2011-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101130

2011-09-28 [27W] PATENT REVOKED

- Effective date: 20110526

2011-08-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110801

2011-05-26 [REG DE R064] EPO'S REVOCATION DECISION NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 60039671

2011-05-26 [REG DE R103] PATENT REVOKED BY EPO

- Document: DE 60039671

2011-03-23 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: BORGWARNER BERU SYSTEMS GMBH

- Effective date: 20090422

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20091123

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20091112

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-06-03 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: BERU AG

- Effective date: 20090422

2008-09-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60039671 P 20080911

2008-07-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2006-10-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060911

2006-05-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2006-01-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20051121

2005-08-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2005-08-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI