EP 1102018 A1 20010523 - Piping cleaning method of air conditioner, compounds used therein, and piping cleaning apparatus
Title (en)
Piping cleaning method of air conditioner, compounds used therein, and piping cleaning apparatus
Title (de)
Verfahren zur Reinigung einer Rohrleitung, Reinigungslaufteufels zum Gebrauch darin, und Rohrleitungreinigungsvorrichtung
Title (fr)
Procédé pour le nettoyage des canalisations, goupillon de nettoyage utilisé dans celui-ci, et dispositif de nettoyage des canalisations
Publication
Application
Priority
- JP 32510299 A 19991116
- JP 2000037848 A 20000216
- JP 2000039566 A 20000217
- JP 2000039567 A 20000217
Abstract (en)
When changing from an air conditioner having an existing piping (6) to a new air conditioner, the existing piping (6) can be used as it is. In this method, an air conditioner having an excellent long-term reliability can be installed. A piping cleaning method of air conditioner for removing foreign matter existing in the piping installed between an indoor unit and an outdoor unit includes (a) a step of inserting a compound (7) from an opening of the piping, (b) a step of leading a compressed gas from the opening into the piping, and conveying the compound (7) through the piping while keeping the compound (7) in contact with the inner wall of the piping, and (c) a step of removing the foreign matter existing in the piping, together with the compound (7), from the piping. <IMAGE>
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
B08B 9/04 (2006.01); F25B 47/00 (2006.01); F28G 1/12 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
B08B 9/0553 (2013.01); F25B 47/00 (2013.01); F28G 1/12 (2013.01); F41B 11/87 (2013.01); F24F 2221/22 (2013.01)
Citation (search report)
- [XAY] US 5555585 A 19960917 - FOWLER JEFFREY B [AU]
- [Y] EP 0952407 A2 19991027 - MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]
- [Y] US 2906650 A 19590929 - WHEATON ESTEL O
- [Y] DE 4111452 A1 19921015 - BUEHLER GMBH [DE]
- [Y] EP 0828132 A2 19980311 - KYOKUTO RUBBER CO LTD [JP]
- [Y] DE 2136148 A1 19730201 - SCHIEMENTZ GEORG
- [Y] US 4373225 A 19830215 - V ECKARDSTEIN KARL-ERNST [DE], et al
- [Y] US 1673890 A 19280619 - HOPE SMITH ERNEST
- [A] US 3725968 A 19730410 - KNAPP K, et al
- [A] US 5263220 A 19931123 - CAMPBELL DOUG C [CA]
- [A] US 3543323 A 19701201 - GIRARD HARRY J
- [A] US 4898197 A 19900206 - BARRY PETER L [AU], et al
- [A] DE 29711840 U1 19971030 - FOERSTER MARTIN [DE]
- [Y] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 017, no. 591 (C - 1125) 28 October 1993 (1993-10-28)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 007, no. 092 (M - 208) 16 April 1983 (1983-04-16)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 010, no. 385 (M - 548) 24 December 1986 (1986-12-24)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1996, no. 10 31 October 1996 (1996-10-31)
Designated contracting state (EPC)
ES GR IT
DOCDB simple family (publication)
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 00124725 A 20001113