Global Patent Index - EP 1102024 A1

EP 1102024 A1 2001-05-23 - Method for adjusting the elevation and traversing position of a gun with three barrels and device for putting into practice such a method

Title (en)

Method for adjusting the elevation and traversing position of a gun with three barrels and device for putting into practice such a method

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Höhen- und Seitenverstellung der Läufe einer dreiläufigen Waffe und Vorrichtung zur Durchführung des Verfahrens

Title (fr)

Méthode pour ajuster la position d'élévation et de traversement d'une arme à trois canons et dispositif pour la mise en ouvre d'une telle méthode

Publication

EP 1102024 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00119254 A

Priority

DE 19955999 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19955999C1] To calibrate a triple-barrel weapon, with height and side settings for each barrel, a bracket (5) is rigidly fixed to the first barrel (1). An alignment holder (9) is fitted to the bracket (5) with a release mounting, so that the muzzle ends of the other two barrels (2,3) lie at a nominal position to the muzzle end of the first barrel (1). The three barrels (1-3) are loaded and fired. On an unacceptably large drift of the shot from the first barrel (1) at the target by the other two barrels (2,3), the alignment holder (9) is replaced to shift the muzzles of the barrels (2,3) in relation to the muzzle of the first barrel (1) to correct the drift.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zur Höhen- und Seitenverstellung der Läufe einer dreiläufigen Waffe, bei welchem die Läufe am hinteren patronenlagerseitigen Ende starr miteinander verbunden sind. Hierbei wird am ersten Lauf (1) ein Sockel (5) starr angebracht. Mit diesem Sockel (5) wird eine erste Laufhalterung (9) lösbar verbunden, welche die Mündungsenden der beiden anderen Läufe (2, 3) in ihrer Sollposition relativ zum Mündungsende des ersten Laufs (1) lagert. Sodann wird ein Beschuß aller drei Läufe (1, 2, 3) vorgenommen. Bei einer unzulässig großen Abweichung der Treffpunktlage mindestens eines der beiden anderen Läufe (2, 3) relativ zur Treffpunktlage des ersten Laufs (1) wird die erste Laufhalterung gegen eine solche ausgetauscht, bei welcher die Lage des Mündungsendes des in der Treffpunktlage abweichenden Laufs relativ zum Mündungsende des ersten Laufs (1) in Richtung einer Verminderung der Abweichung verändert ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F41A 21/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41A 21/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41A 21/08 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19955999 C1 20001012; AT 285559 T 20050115; DK 1102024 T3 20050124; EP 1102024 A1 20010523; EP 1102024 B1 20041222

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160906

2017-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160906

2017-05-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 285559 T

- Effective date: 20160906

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161117

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150922

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20150914

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-05-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120906

2013-10-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121001

2013-08-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121001

2013-08-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130401

2013-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120930

2013-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120930

2013-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120930

2013-06-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130531

2013-06-03 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2013-04-30 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2013-04-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120906

2013-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120907

2013-04-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2013-04-17 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130401

2013-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *BLASER JAGDWAFFEN G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20120930

2012-01-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20111005

- Year of fee payment: 12

2012-01-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20111003

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-12-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20110901

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-11-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20110920

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110923

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20110919

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20110927

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-10-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20110912

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050522

2005-12-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050923

2005-09-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050930

2005-09-06 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050906

2005-08-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-07-27 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-07-20 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20041222

2005-04-02 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050402

2005-03-22 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050322

2005-01-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50009017 P 20050127

2005-01-26 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2005-01-24 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2004-12-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-12-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: LUCHS & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE

2004-12-28 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-12-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-12-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-12-22 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041222

2004-12-22 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041222

2003-11-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030923

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010727

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI