Global Patent Index - EP 1102028 A2

EP 1102028 A2 2001-05-23 - Infra-red camouflage system

Title (en)

Infra-red camouflage system

Title (de)

Infrarot-Tarnsystem

Title (fr)

Dispositif de camouflage infrarouge

Publication

EP 1102028 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00118573 A

Priority

DE 19955609 A

Abstract (en)

An infra-red camouflage system comprises a thermorefractive layer system or a thermorefractive material. The material has a negative temp coefft.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Infrarot-Tarnsystem. Es umfasst ein thermorefraktives Schichtsystem oder ein thermorefraktives Material, dessen Wärmeemissionsgrad einen negativen Temperaturkoeffizienten aufweist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F41J 2/00; F41H 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41H 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41H 3/00 (2013.01); Y10S 428/913 (2013.01); Y10S 428/919 (2013.01); Y10T 428/25 (2013.01); Y10T 428/31678 (2015.04)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1102028 A2 20010523; EP 1102028 A3 20031001; CA 2326191 A1 20010711; DE 19955609 A1 20010613; DE 19955609 B4 20040916; US 6753075 B1 20040622

INPADOC legal status


2006-10-11 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060413

2004-11-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041007

2004-08-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: OGUS NETZE & WIRKWAREN GMBH & CO. KG

2004-08-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040607

2004-08-04 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-07-29 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2004-06-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2003-10-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-10-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI