Global Patent Index - EP 1102029 A2

EP 1102029 A2 2001-05-23 - Propellant charge with multi-point ignition

Title (en)

Propellant charge with multi-point ignition

Title (de)

Treibladung mit einer Mehrpunktanzündung

Title (fr)

Charge propulsive munie d'un système d'allumage à plusieurs points

Publication

EP 1102029 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00123832 A

Priority

  • DE 19955945 A
  • DE 10024464 A

Abstract (en)

In the casing (1), igniters (9) are connected to a programmable electronic unit (10) in which their individual addresses are stored. The connection is via a multicore bus (4) to an igniter unit (11), which is connected to a firing control computer. An Independent claim is included for the method of ignition. The temperature of the charge is measured and sent to the firing control computer. Individual characteristics of the charge are read out from the electronic unit (10) and sent to the firing control computer. The number of igniters and the sequence of ignitions are determined. The ignition impulses are transmitted.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Hochleistungsantrieb mit in einer Hülse (1) angeordnetem Treibladungspulver und einem pyrotechnischen Anzünder (9) zur Anzündung des Treibladungspulvers, wobei der Anzünder (9) einen Anzündsatz (5) und gegebenenfalls eine Verstärkerladung (6) enthält. Zur Verbesserung der innenballistischen Verhältnisse bei der Anzündung wird vorgeschlagen, daß in der Hülse (1) mehrere Anzünder (9) angeordnet sind, daß alle Anzünder (9) über eine programmierbare elektronische Einheit (10) verfügen, in der eine individuelle Adresse gespeichert ist, daß die Anzünder (9) über eine zwei- oder mehradrige Busleitung (4) mit einem Anzündstück (11) verbunden sind und daß das Anzündstück (11) an einen Feuerleitrechner anschließbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F42B 5/08; F41A 19/58

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41A 19/58 (2006.01); F42B 5/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41A 19/58 (2013.01); F42B 5/08 (2013.01); F42B 35/00 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1102029 A2 20010523; EP 1102029 A3 20020612; EP 1102029 B1 20060301; AT 319069 T 20060315; DE 50012290 D1 20060427; DK 1102029 T3 20060703; ES 2261138 T3 20061116; US 6543362 B1 20030408

INPADOC legal status


2018-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20180602

2018-06-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50012290

2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171123

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-28 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20171114

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20171120

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20171124

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20171120

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20171220

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20171121

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20171120

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20171122

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171121

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-12-12 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50012290

- Representative's name: BOEHMERT & BOEHMERT ANWALTSPARTNERSCHAFT MBB -, DE

2017-11-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170124

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-11-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2008-11-28 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060301

2008-07-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061102

2008-07-31 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060301

2008-02-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061102

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: RUAG AMMOTEC G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20061130

2007-09-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG;POSTFACH 1772;8027 ZUERICH (CH)

2007-02-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20061204

2006-11-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2006-11-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2006-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2261138 T3

2006-10-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-10-18 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2006-08-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2006-08-01 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060801

2006-07-03 [REG DK T3] EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS

2006-06-30 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20060401844

2006-06-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-06-20 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2006-04-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50012290 P 20060427

2006-04-05 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2006-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2006-03-01 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-03-01 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060301

2006-03-01 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060301

2006-01-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: RUAG AMMOTEC GMBH

2005-05-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050411

2003-03-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-02-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021212

2002-06-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-06-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI