Global Patent Index - EP 1102120 A3

EP 1102120 A3 2001-12-19 - Thermally processable imaging element

Title (en)

Thermally processable imaging element

Title (de)

Wärmeentwickelbares Bildaufzeichnungsmaterial

Title (fr)

Matériau d'enregistrement d'images développable à la chaleur

Publication

EP 1102120 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00203665 A

Priority

US 43389699 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1102120A2] This invention comprises thermally processable imaging element comprising: (a) a support, (b) a thermally processable imaging layer on one side of the support; and (c) a protective layer comprising a binder and matte particles comprising a crosslinked polymer, wherein the protective layer has been applied as a solution of binder and matte particles in a coating solvent in which the binder is soluble and the matte particles are swellable to the extent of about 160 to about 390 %.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03C 1/498; B41M 5/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03C 1/76 (2006.01); G03C 1/498 (2006.01); G03C 1/74 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03C 1/49872 (2013.01); Y10S 430/151 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1102120 A2 20010523; EP 1102120 A3 20011219; EP 1102120 B1 20050720; DE 60021338 D1 20050825; JP 2001166422 A 20010622; US 6225038 B1 20010501

INPADOC legal status


2006-06-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060421

2006-02-21 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF THE APPLICANT RENOUNCES

- Effective date: 20060221

2005-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20051031

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-08-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60021338 P 20050825

2005-07-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE

2005-05-25 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE

2003-07-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030616

2002-09-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2002-07-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020430

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-12-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 03C 1/498 A, 7B 41M 5/40 B

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI