Global Patent Index - EP 1102128 A2

EP 1102128 A2 2001-05-23 - Holder mechanism for a dielectric carrying member in an electrostatographic reproduction apparatus

Title (en)

Holder mechanism for a dielectric carrying member in an electrostatographic reproduction apparatus

Title (de)

Gleitstützmechanismus für ein dielektrisches Trägerelement in einem elektrostatographischen Vervielfältigungsapparat

Title (fr)

Méchanisme de support d'un élément porteur d'un diélectrique dans un appareil de reproduction électrostatographique

Publication

EP 1102128 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00124992 A

Priority

US 44375499 A

Abstract (en)

The support device includes a slider (12) comprising slide elements (20,22) fixed to a frame (24). End fixtures are connected to a roller-shaped component of the copier. The end fixtures and cam path surfaces define a predetermined distance from the longitudinal axis of the roller shaped component. A load arm (36) presses the frame of the slider in one direction so that the slide elements remain in contact with the cam path surfaces of the end fixtures and the plane of a section of the dielectric carrier is retained at a certain distance from the roller-shaped component.

Abstract (de)

Eine Stützvorrichtung (10) zur genauen Positionierung eines dielektrischen Trägerelements (14) für einen elektrostatographischen Vervielfältigungsapparat in Wirkverbindung mit einer walzenförmigen Komponente (16) eines Vervielfältigungsapparats. Die Stützvorrichtung (10) umfasst einen langgestreckten Rahmen (24) mit einer Vielzahl von Gleitelementen (20, 22), die in dem Rahmen (24) angeordnet sind. Die Gleitelemente (20, 22) bilden eine Ebene für einen Abschnitt des dielektrischen Trägerelements (14). Die Endbefestigungen (42), die mit der walzenförmigen Komponente (16) verbunden sind, definieren jeweils die Nockenbahnoberflächen (42a) in einem vorgegebenem Abstand von der Längsachse der walzenförmigen Komponente (16). Ein Lastarm (36) drängt den Rahmen (24) in eine Richtung, um die Gleitelemente (20, 22) in Verbindung mit den Nockenbahnoberflächen (42a) der Endbefestigungen (42) zu halten, so dass die Ebene des Abschnitts des dielektrischen Trägerelements (14) im Wesentlichen in einem vorgegebenen Abstand von der walzenförmigen Komponente (16) erhalten bleibt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03G 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03G 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03G 15/754 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1102128 A2 20010523; EP 1102128 A3 20020502; DE 10057103 A1 20010523

INPADOC legal status


2003-12-10 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030603

2003-01-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-06-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020327

2002-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI