Global Patent Index - EP 1102130 A2

EP 1102130 A2 2001-05-23 - Device for sealing a schaft bearing in developer units of electrographic reproduction machines

Title (en)

Device for sealing a schaft bearing in developer units of electrographic reproduction machines

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Abdichten von Wellenlagern in Entwicklerstationen in elektrographischen Reproduktionseinrichtungen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour rendre étanche un palier d'arbre dans des unités de développement de machines de reproduction électrographique

Publication

EP 1102130 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00124298 A

Priority

US 44418199 A

Abstract (en)

A housing contains developer material (D). A drive shaft (32) is provided with a number of sealing pieces (70a to 70d), increasing towards the outside along the longitudinal axis of the drive shaft from the housing in the direction of the bearing. At least one of the sealing pieces is rotatable with the drive shaft, while the adjoining sealing pieces are fixed. Several drive shafts may be arranged in the housing. An Independent claim is included for a developer station in an electrographic reproducing apparatus.

Abstract (de)

Die vorliegende Erfindung betrifft eine Vorrichtung (70) zum Abdichten von Wellenlagern (62,64) in einer Entwicklerstation (10) einer elektrographischen Reproduktionseinrichtung, mit einem Gehäuse (12) das Entwicklermaterial (D) enthält, mit mindestens einer Antriebswelle (32, 42), die in einem Lager (62,64) gelagert ist, das in dem Gehäuse (12) angeordneten ist und eine Vielzahl von der Antriebswelle (32) zugeordneten Dichtungselementen (70a-70d), die in Richtung der Längsachse der Antriebswelle (32) vom Gehäuse (12) mit dem Entwicklermaterial (D) in Richtung des Lagers (62) zunehmend nach außen verlaufen und von denen mindestens eines mit der Antriebswelle (32) drehbar ist, während die angrenzenden Dichtungselemente ortsfest angeordnet sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03G 15/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03G 15/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03G 15/0898 (2013.01); G03G 15/0822 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

US 4887132 A 19891212 - JOSEPH BRIAN J [US], et al

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1102130 A2 20010523; EP 1102130 A3 20020502; AU 4708101 A 20010625; DE 10056721 A1 20010613; US 6295425 B1 20010925; WO 0144876 A2 20010621; WO 0144876 A3 20020207

INPADOC legal status


2003-12-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030602

2003-01-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-06-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020405

2002-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI