Global Patent Index - EP 1102148 A1

EP 1102148 A1 2001-05-23 - Low temperature corrected voltage generating device

Title (en)

Low temperature corrected voltage generating device

Title (de)

Niedrigtemperaturkorrigierte Spannungsgeneratoreinrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif générateur de tension corrigé à basse température.

Publication

EP 1102148 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00403128 A

Priority

FR 9914284 A

Abstract (en)

The circuit has a component sensitive to low temperature changes in order to control the amplifier final output voltage. The constant voltage generator comprises a reference voltage generator (110) and an amplifier (126) connected between this reference voltage generator and the output terminal. A voltage divider (130) is connected to one input of the amplifier to provide a feedback voltage. The voltage divider comprises at least a first resistance (132) in series with an element (150) whose resistance varies as a function of the prevailing low temperature. The temperature dependence of this resistance value is different from that of the first resistance (132) and thus this provides a feedback which is smaller in the lower part of the temperature range.

Abstract (fr)

Dispositif générateur de tension constante corrigé à basse température comprenant : un générateur de tension de référence (110), un amplificateur (126) connecté entre le générateur de tension de référence et une borne de sortie, un diviseur de tension (130) et relié à une entrée de l'amplificateur pour fournir à l'amplificateur une tension de contre-réaction, Conformément à l'invention le diviseur comprend au moins une première résistance (132) en série avec un élément (150) présentant, au moins dans ladite gamme de températures basses, une impédance avec un comportement de dépendance en température différent de celui de ladite première résistance de façon à fournir une contre-réaction plus faible dans ladite gamme de températures basses. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G05F 3/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G05F 3/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G05F 3/30 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1102148 A1 20010523; EP 1102148 B1 20050504; DE 60019878 D1 20050609; DE 60019878 T2 20060216; FR 2801116 A1 20010518; FR 2801116 B1 20020125; US 6407638 B1 20020618

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081130

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081110

2009-09-11 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090731

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081110

2009-07-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20081110

2008-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20071029

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20071129

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-02-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20071130

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-06-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070601

2006-04-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060207

2005-11-03 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20051103

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-09-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050824

2005-06-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60019878 P 20050609

2005-05-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2005-05-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-08-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030618

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2001-12-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: STMICROELECTRONICS S.A.

2001-10-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010810

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-05-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI