Global Patent Index - EP 1102164 A2

EP 1102164 A2 2001-05-23 - Microprocessor system

Title (en)

Microprocessor system

Title (de)

Mikroprozessorsystem

Title (fr)

Système de microprocesseur

Publication

EP 1102164 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00125496 A

Priority

JP 33196099 A

Abstract (en)

There is provided a microprocessor system that can execute a specific set of instructions at a high speed while limiting the increase in size of the circuitry. The microprocessor system, which executes instructions described in a program, comprises a main processor (100) which executes a first set of instructions by means of hardware and executes a second set of instructions by means of software and a co-processor (200) which operates under the control of the main processor to execute the second set of instructions by means of hardware. When the co-processor (200) encounters a specific instructions of the second set for which data under the control of the main processor needs to be operated, the co-processor issues a notification of this fact to the main processor (100) to request it to execute the specific instruction. In this case, the co-processor updates its stack pointer and program counter by itself by means of hardware. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 9/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 15/16 (2006.01); G06F 9/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 9/3877 (2013.01); G06F 9/3879 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1102164 A2 20010523; EP 1102164 A3 20020904; JP 2001147902 A 20010529; JP 3621315 B2 20050216; US 7200741 B1 20070403

INPADOC legal status


2008-04-23 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080317

2008-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20071213

2003-05-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-05-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: NEC ELECTRONICS CORPORATION

2002-11-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI