Global Patent Index - EP 1102187 A2

EP 1102187 A2 2001-05-23 - Method of predicting and optimizing fuel production

Title (en)

Method of predicting and optimizing fuel production

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Vorhersagen und Optimieren der Treibstoffproduktion

Title (fr)

Méthode pour la prédiction et l'optimisation de la production d'un carburant

Publication

EP 1102187 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00310213 A

Priority

US 44196499 A

Abstract (en)

A process for the prediction and the optimization of the output of a plant producing products from incoming materials. The incoming materials are classified according to various physical characteristics and costs. The desired or ordered products arc also classified according to price and physical requirements. The incoming materials information and the product information is entered into a database which is accessible by a computing device. The computing device then calculates the optimal production process by calculating a plurality of production cycles and selecting the cycle with the optimum profitability. The computing device is programmed with non-linear equations derived from a regressive analysis of data collected from samples of incoming materials and products. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10J 1/00; G06F 17/60

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10L 1/00 (2006.01); C10G 7/12 (2006.01); C10L 1/08 (2006.01); G06Q 10/04 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G05B 21/00 (2013.01); G06Q 10/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1102187 A2 20010523; EP 1102187 A3 20050427; JP 2001192679 A 20010717; SG 99319 A1 20031027; US 6611735 B1 20030826

INPADOC legal status


2006-07-19 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20051028

2006-04-20 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2006-01-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2005-09-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: AFTON CHEMICAL INTANGIBLES LLC

2005-04-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2005-04-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2005-04-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 10J 1/00 A

2005-04-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 06F 17/60 B

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI