Global Patent Index - EP 1102214 A1

EP 1102214 A1 2001-05-23 - Secure accounting module for a franking machine

Title (en)

Secure accounting module for a franking machine

Title (de)

Gesicherter Buchhaltungsmodul für eine Frankiermaschine

Title (fr)

Module de comptabilisation sécurisé pour machine à affranchir

Publication

EP 1102214 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00403162 A

Priority

FR 9914272 A

Abstract (en)

The accounting module is fitted onto a printed circuit card (12) mounted between a base (14) and a module cover (16). The base has a number of uprights (44) that pass through holes in the printed circuit card. Hollow posts on the underside of the cover fit over the uprights. A ring (18) fits between the cylinder and the upright clamps the two together when the cover is pressed onto the base.

Abstract (fr)

Module de comptabilisation sécurisé d'une machine à affranchir comprenant une carte à circuits imprimés (12) destinée à recevoir des circuits de comptabilisation et montée entre un socle de module (14) et un couvercle de module (16), le socle comportant plusieurs pions de sertissage (44) sur lesquels vient s'enfiler ladite carte et qui sont destinés à coopérer avec des manchons de blocage (60) solidaires du couvercle ; une bague insert (18) interposée entre chaque pion de sertissage et le manchon de blocage correspondant ; des premiers moyens de liaison (84) pour, à l'issue d'un emmanchement forcé du couvercle sur le socle, solidariser cette bague insert avec le couvercle, et des seconds moyens de liaison (48) pour, à l'issue de l'emmanchement forcé du couvercle sur le socle, solidariser cette bague insert avec le socle. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07B 17/00; G06F 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07B 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07B 17/00193 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00233 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1102214 A1 20010523; EP 1102214 B1 20070110; DE 60032859 D1 20070222; DE 60032859 T2 20071025; FR 2801124 A1 20010518; FR 2801124 B1 20020208; US 6468114 B1 20021022

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120601

2012-12-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111130

2012-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111114

2012-09-20 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60032859

- Effective date: 20120601

2012-08-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120731

2012-07-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20111114

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101118

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20101119

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20101130

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-12-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20071011

2007-04-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20070320

2007-02-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60032859 P 20070222

2007-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2007-01-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-01-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CORET, FRANCIS

2007-01-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LE GALLO, STEPHANE

2007-01-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LE JAOUDOUR, THIERRY

2006-08-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G07B 17/00 20060101AFI20060626BHEP

2006-04-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NEOPOST TECHNOLOGIES

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2002-01-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011120

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-05-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI