Global Patent Index - EP 1102217 A2

EP 1102217 A2 2001-05-23 - Verification device

Title (en)

Verification device

Title (de)

Prüfgerät

Title (fr)

Dispositif de vérification

Publication

EP 1102217 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00124994 A

Priority

JP 32631999 A

Abstract (en)

In a truth and falsehood determination device 1, a multiplicity of perforations, which are so fine as to make it difficult for them to be visually observed and composed of a multiplicity of background perforations (5, 9) 5 and a multiplicity of information perforations (6, 10) 6, are disposed in a sttaggered arrangement with respect to the disposition of stripes having colors of R, G, B which constitute a color element screen (2) 2 used to determine truth and falsehood as well as the information perforations (6, 10) 6 are shifted from the backgropund perforations 5 by a predetermined distance x. Further, the background perforations (5, 9) 5 and the information perforations (6, 10) 6 of each row are partially shifted vertically to provide them with binarized data composed of "0" and "1". With this arrangement, the truth and falsehood determination device 1 can prevent forgery and alteration of precious prints. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07D 7/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B44F 1/12 (2006.01); B42D 15/10 (2006.01); D21H 21/48 (2006.01); G07D 7/00 (2006.01); G07D 7/20 (2006.01); G07F 7/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07D 7/20 (2013.01); G07F 7/086 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1102217 A2 20010523; EP 1102217 A3 20030910; EP 1102217 B1 20060816; DE 60030066 D1 20060928; DE 60030066 T2 20070315; JP 2001138699 A 20010522; JP 3306510 B2 20020724

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20171124

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171123

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-02-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20171120

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171121

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171121

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-11-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-11-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-02-27 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Effective date: 20150126

2014-12-31 [REG CH PCOW] CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF PATENT OWNER(S)

- Free text: NEW ADDRESS: 2-5, TORANOMON 2-CHOME MINATO-KU, 105-8445 TOKYO (JP)

2007-09-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG;POSTFACH 1772;8027 ZUERICH (CH)

2007-07-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070518

2007-01-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-12-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2006-09-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60030066 P 20060928

2006-09-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2006-08-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2006-08-16 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060816

2005-03-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050121

2004-06-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2004-01-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031121

2003-09-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: NATIONAL PRINTING BUREAU, INCORPORATED ADMINISTRAT

2003-09-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-09-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-09-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 07D 7/20 A

2003-09-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 06K 19/06 B

2003-09-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 42D 15/00 B

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI