Global Patent Index - EP 1102221 A2

EP 1102221 A2 2001-05-23 - A product dispensing system configured to show an electronic slide show

Title (en)

A product dispensing system configured to show an electronic slide show

Title (de)

Zum präsentieren einer elektronischen Diavorführung konfiguriertes Produktausgabesystem

Title (fr)

Système de distribution de produits configuré pour présenter un montage électronique de diapositives

Publication

EP 1102221 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00310149 A

Priority

  • US 44180999 A
  • US 44225999 A

Abstract (en)

A product dispenser 30, typically for fuel, includes a visual display 40 connected to a computer 19 within a fuel station building. The computer 19 is programmed to transmit for viewing on the display 40 a slide show which may incorporate advertising material, announcements or other useful information that customers fuelling their vehicles may want to know. The computer 18 may download images from a central remote location 14 so that all fuel stations of a particular company are showing the same images. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07F 9/02; G07F 13/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07F 9/02 (2006.01); G07F 13/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07F 13/025 (2013.01); G07F 9/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1102221 A2 20010523; EP 1102221 A3 20020502; AU 7167600 A 20010524

INPADOC legal status


2003-09-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021105

2003-02-27 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-01-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI