Global Patent Index - EP 1102243 A2

EP 1102243 A2 2001-05-23 - Method and apparatus for interference suppresion in the output signal of a sound transducer

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for interference suppresion in the output signal of a sound transducer

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Unterdrückung eines Störsignals im Ausgangssignal eines Schallwandlermittels

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour la suppresion d'interférence d'un signal de sortie d'un transducteur acoustique

Publication

EP 1102243 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00125116 A

Priority

DE 19955156 A

Abstract (en)

The method involves generating a noise signal reference and performing spectral subtraction (20). The sound transducer has a pressure gradient sensor with a sensitivity minimum for a definable spatial angle aligned with the useful signal source. The noise signal reference (21) is generated from the output signal of the pressure gradient sensor. The sensitivity minimum can be a null sensitivity point. Independent claims are also included for the following: an arrangement for suppressing a noise signal in a sound transducer output signal.

Abstract (de)

2. Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zur Unterdrückung eines Störsignalanteils im Ausgangssignal eines Schallwandlermittels, das neben dem Störsignal ein Nutzsignal einer Nutzsignalquelle empfängt, durch Generierung einer Störsignalreferenz (21) und Spektralsubtraktion (20), dadurch gekennzeichnet, daß das Schallwandlermittel einen Druckgradientenaufnehmer (1) mit einem Empfindlichkeitsminimum, insbesondere einer Nullstelle der Empfindlichkeit, für einen vorgebbaren Raumwinkel aufweist und daß das Empfindlichkeitsminimum auf die Nutzsignalquelle ausgerichtet wird sowie eine zugehörige Vorrichtung. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G10L 21/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G10L 21/02 (2013.01); G10L 21/0208 (2013.01); G10L 21/0216 (2013.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G10L 21/02 (2013.01); G10L 21/0208 (2013.01); G10L 2021/02165 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1102243 A2 20010523; EP 1102243 A3 20011107; DE 19955156 A1 20010621

INPADOC legal status


2006-08-23 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060221

2005-11-02 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR INTERFERENCE SUPPRESSION IN THE OUTPUT SIGNAL OF A SOUND TRANSDUCER

2005-03-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: IHLE, DR., MARC

2002-07-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-05-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020313

2001-11-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-11-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-11-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 10L 21/02 A, 7H 04R 1/38 B

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI