Global Patent Index - EP 1102288 A1

EP 1102288 A1 2001-05-23 - Contact piece for use in an axial magnetic field of a vacuum chamber

Title (en)

Contact piece for use in an axial magnetic field of a vacuum chamber

Title (de)

Kontaktstück für Axialmagnetfeldanwendungen in einer Vakuumkammer

Title (fr)

Pièce de contact pour l'utilisation dans un champ magnétique axial d'une chambre à vide

Publication

EP 1102288 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00123895 A

Priority

  • DE 19954949 A
  • DE 10040297 A

Abstract (en)

A connection element (78) made of non-magnetic or slightly magnetic material is connected to plate-like components (76,77) made of magnetic material. The plate-like components and the connection elements are configured so as to avoid short circuit of magnetic flux between the connected plate components.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung bezieht sich auf eine Vakuumkammer, mit wenigstens einem Polstück (84, 85), einer Kontaktschicht (90) sowie einer Struktur (13) zur mechanischen Verstärkung des Kontaktstückes (14). Die Struktur (13) weist wenigstens ein Bauelement (76, 77) aus einem magnetischen Werkstoff sowie ein Verbindungselement (78) aus einem unmagnetischen oder gering magnetischen Werkstoff auf, wobei das Verbindungselement (78) fest mit dem wenigstens einen Bauelement (76, 77) verbunden ist. Das wenigstens eine Bauelement (76, 77) sowie das Verbindungselement (78) sind so einander zugeordnet, daß ein magnetischer Kurzschluß zwischen den wenigstens zwei Bauelementen (76, 77) vermieden ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 1/02; H01H 33/66

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 33/18 (2006.01); H01H 33/664 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 33/664 (2013.01); H01H 33/185 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1102288 A1 20010523

INPADOC legal status


2003-12-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030603

2003-03-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030123

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT NL

2002-01-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20011121

2001-10-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ABB PATENT GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2001-05-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI