Global Patent Index - EP 1102294 A2

EP 1102294 A2 2001-05-23 - Rotary knob with key function

Title (en)

Rotary knob with key function

Title (de)

Drehknopf mit Tastfunktion

Title (fr)

Bouton rotatif avec fonction de touche

Publication

EP 1102294 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00122924 A

Priority

DE 19964131 A

Abstract (en)

The knob (2) is hollow with a counterpart that is electrically connected to an operating member. The knob and the pushbutton (5) are supported by a holder (6) located within in the knob, and are separately operated by the holder. A switch plunger (11) with a centric lead-through (11.2) is arranged under the pushbutton, so that a button symbol (10) is centrically illuminated, and centric contacting is achieved below the pushbutton. The knob may control a potentiometer. An LED is typically used to provide illumination.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Drehknopf mit Tastfunktion. Drehknöpfe (2, 23, 41) mit Tastfunktion, die Bestandteil eines Drehschalters (20) und / oder eines Drehstellers (1) sind, finden in Bedieneinheiten, beispielsweise der Kraftfahrzeugtechnik, ihren Einsatz. Dabei ist im Drehknopf (2, 23) eine Taste integriert, die die Tastfunktion aus der Stirnfläche des Drehknopfes (2, 23) heraus realisiert. Diese Taste ist jedoch nicht unabhängig der Drehverstellung des Drehknopfes (2, 23). Dadurch wird die Taste immer mit verstellt. Hiergegen sieht die vorliegende Lösung vor, in einen Drehknopf (2, 23) eine Taste (5, 30) funktional losgelöst von diesem zu integrieren, so daß bei Verstellung des Drehknopfes (2, 23) die Taste (5, 30) nicht mit verstellt wird. Dazu ist innerhalb des Drehknopfes (2, 23) eine Halterung (6, 24.1) angebracht, wodurch der Drehknopf (2, 23) und die Taste (5, 30) konstruktiv miteinander verbunden, jedoch funktional getrennt sind. Die Drehverstellung wird durch den Drehknopf (2, 23) übertragen, während über die separate Taste (5, 30) die Tastfunktion durchgeführt wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 25/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 19/58 (2006.01); G05G 1/10 (2006.01); H01H 3/08 (2006.01); H01H 9/16 (2006.01); H01H 25/00 (2006.01); H01H 25/06 (2006.01); H01H 89/00 (2006.01); H01H 9/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G05G 1/105 (2013.01); H01H 25/065 (2013.01); H01H 9/182 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1102294 A2 20010523; EP 1102294 A3 20030402; EP 1102294 B1 20050511; DE 19964131 A1 20010621; ES 2239990 T3 20051016; JP 2001189117 A 20010710; US 6667446 B1 20031223

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110502

2011-09-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50010276

- Effective date: 20110502

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20091026

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071021

2008-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061023

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061031

2008-01-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20061023

2007-07-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070629

2006-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061031

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-05-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060214

2006-03-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-10-18 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20051018

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2239990 T3

2005-10-14 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20051014

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-06-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50010276 P 20050616

2005-06-15 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2005-05-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2004-06-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: PREH GMBH

2004-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2003-07-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030603

2003-05-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030215

2003-04-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-04-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-04-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI