Global Patent Index - EP 1102296 A2

EP 1102296 A2 2001-05-23 - Circuit breaker

Title (en)

Circuit breaker

Title (de)

Lastschalter

Title (fr)

Disjoncteur

Publication

EP 1102296 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00123896 A

Priority

DE 19955217 A

Abstract (en)

The load switch has a ceramic insulating body sealed vacuum tight by covers at both ends and with fixed and movable contact pieces and a folding bellows, a thrust tube containing the load switch and separate fixed contact elements bridged by the thrust tube in the on state to carry the rated current. A movable contact stem is spring biased towards switch-on. A restoring spring exerts a switch-off force on the movable stem during switching off. The load switch has a ceramic insulating body sealed vacuum tight by covers (18,19) at both ends and with fixed and movable contact pieces (21,24) and a folding bellows (23), a thrust tube (15) containing the load switch and that interacts with two separate fixed contact elements that are bridged by the thrust tube in the on state to carry the rated current. One contact element has a latch for a latching head on a fixed contact stem. The free end of a movable contact stem (22) is attached to a slide contact electrically connected to the thrust tube. The movable stem is spring biased towards switch-on. A restoring spring (33) exerts a switch-off force on the movable stem during switching off.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Lastschalter mit einem Isolierkörper aus Keramik, der an beiden Enden mittels jeweils eines Deckels vakuumdicht verschlossen ist, mit einem an einem feststehenden Kontaktstengel befestigten ortsfesten Kontaktstück, das einen der Deckel durchgreift, mit einem beweglichen Kontaktstück, das an einem beweglichen Kontaktstengel befestigt ist, und mit einem Faltenbalg, der zwischen dem anderen Deckel und dem beweglichen Kontaktstengel angeordnet ist, mit einem Schubrohr, in dem sich der Lastschalter befindet und das mit zwei feststehenden Kontaktelementen zusammenwirkt, die in Abstand zueinander angeordnet sind und im eingeschalteten Zustand von dem Schubrohr überbrückt sind, und so den Nennstrom führen, wobei ferner in einem der Kontaktelemente eine Verrastung für einen am feststehenden Kontaktstengel angebrachten Rastkopf vorgesehen ist, daß das freie Ende des beweglichen Kontaktstengels an einem Gleitkontakt befestigt ist, der mit dem Schubrohr elektrisch leitend verbunden ist, daß der bewegliche Kontaktstengel mittels einer Kontaktdruckfeder federnd in Einschaltrichtung beaufschlagt ist, und daß am beweglichen Kontaktstengel eine Rückholfeder angeformt ist, die beim Ausschaltvorgang eine Ausschaltkraft auf den beweglichen Kontaktstengel ausübt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 33/66; H01H 33/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 33/12 (2006.01); H01H 33/666 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 33/6661 (2013.01); H01H 33/127 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1102296 A2 20010523; EP 1102296 A3 20030115; DE 19955217 A1 20010523

INPADOC legal status


2004-04-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030716

2003-10-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2003-01-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-01-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-10-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ABB PATENT GMBH

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI