Global Patent Index - EP 1102362 A1

EP 1102362 A1 2001-05-23 - Electric outlet with sealing bellow

Title (en)

Electric outlet with sealing bellow

Title (de)

Elektrische Steckdose mit Dichtungsbalg

Title (fr)

Socle de prise de courant muni d'un dispositif d'étanchéité à soufflet

Publication

EP 1102362 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00403159 A

Priority

FR 9914554 A

Abstract (en)

The electrical connector outlet socket had a lid (5) and electrical contacts (2) which are mounted in an insulating support (3) in a casing (4) which co-operate with opposing contacts in a connector (8). An inflated seal (14) is provided around the insulating support between it and the casing. An elastic spring is provided to bias the seal to a deployed position. The seal has a folded position in which it is biased by the front face of the connector against the spring.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne un socle de prise de courant (1) à couvercle (5) pourvu de contacts électriques (2) qui sont montés dans un support isolant (3) aménagé dans un carter (4) et qui sont destinés à coopérer avec des contacts antagonistes (9) d'un connecteur (8) également muni d'un carter (10) prévu pour venir s'introduire entre le support isolant (3) et le carter (4) du socle (1) au cours de l'accouplement du connecteur et du socle. Le socle selon l'invention est remarquable en ce qu'un joint à soufflet (14) est aménagé de manière étanche autour du support isolant (3) du socle (1), entre ledit support isolant (3) et le carter (4) du socle tandis qu'au moins un moyen élastique (12) est prévu pour solliciter ledit joint (14) vers une position déployée, ledit joint prenant une position repliée lorsqu'il est sollicité par l'extrémité frontale du carter (10) du connecteur (8) à l'encontre de l'effet dudit moyen élastique (12). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/62; H01R 13/453; H01R 13/502; H01R 13/52

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/453 (2006.01); H01R 13/52 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/5202 (2013.01); H01R 13/4538 (2013.01); H01R 13/5213 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1102362 A1 20010523; EP 1102362 B1 20040128; AU 7148200 A 20010524; AU 761526 B2 20030605; BR 0005402 A 20010925; CA 2325770 A1 20010519; DE 60007941 D1 20040304; DE 60007941 T2 20041223; ES 2211479 T3 20040716; FR 2801432 A1 20010525; FR 2801432 B1 20011221; JP 2001167841 A 20010622; MX PA00011189 A 20030312; TW 486844 B 20020511; US 6431888 B1 20020813; ZA 200006521 B 20010521

INPADOC legal status


2007-02-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20051115

2006-07-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20051114

2005-11-15 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051115

2005-11-14 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051114

2005-11-14 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051114

2005-06-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050601

2005-01-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041029

2004-11-19 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20041119

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-11-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20041102

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2211479 T3

2004-03-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60007941 P 20040304

2004-02-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040128

2004-01-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2004-01-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES GB IT

2001-08-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010622

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2001-05-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI