Global Patent Index - EP 1102480 A2

EP 1102480 A2 2001-05-23 - A method for locating a program by searching in a program guide according to search criteria

Title (en)

A method for locating a program by searching in a program guide according to search criteria

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Lokalisierung einer Sendung durch suchen in einem Programmführer nach Suchkriterien

Title (fr)

Procédé permettant de repérer un programme en cherchant dans un guide de programmes selon les critères de recherche

Publication

EP 1102480 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 01101582 A

Priority

  • EP 96117991 A
  • US 688995 P
  • US 57444095 A

Abstract (en)

In a television system in which at least program title information for programs which are to be transmitted in the future is transmitted in advance to form a channel guide listing, apparatus is provided for searching the listing for specific user-entered information, and upon successful conclusion to the search, the apparatus schedules the tuning of the desired program, or in the alternative, notifies the viewer of the availability of the program. The invention relates that descriptive text accompanies the program listing, and the apparatus of the invention performs a search of the text for a particular text string which may relate to the title, the star, the director, or the context of the program, among other search criteria. The invention relates that the search is made by using a concatenated search criteria comprising at least two separate search criterion. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04N 5/445; H04N 7/173

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04N 5/445 (2011.01); H04N 5/782 (2006.01); H04N 7/16 (2011.01); H04N 7/173 (2011.01); H04N 5/775 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04N 21/4334 (2013.01); H04N 5/44543 (2013.01); H04N 5/782 (2013.01); H04N 7/163 (2013.01); H04N 7/173 (2013.01); H04N 21/26283 (2013.01); H04N 21/47214 (2013.01); H04N 21/482 (2013.01); H04N 21/4821 (2013.01); H04N 21/4828 (2013.01); H04N 5/775 (2013.01); H04N 21/42204 (2013.01); H04N 21/4316 (2013.01); H04N 21/47 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0774868 A1 19970521; EP 0774868 B1 20020828; EP 0774868 B2 20050330; DE 69623238 D1 20021002; DE 69623238 T2 20030430; DE 69634642 D1 20050525; DE 69634642 T2 20060302; EP 1102480 A2 20010523; EP 1102480 A3 20020306; EP 1102480 B1 20050420; EP 1126700 A2 20010822; EP 1126700 A3 20060816

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20161108

2016-11-30 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20161108

2016-11-09 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69634642

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20151120

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20151124

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151126

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20151130

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-11-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-05-10 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: THOMSON LICENSING, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, INC., INDIANAPOLIS, IND., US

- Document: DE 69634642

- Effective date: 20120315

2012-05-10 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69634642

- Representative's name: ROSSMANITH, MANFRED, DIPL.-PHYS. DR.RER.NAT., DE

- Effective date: 20120315

2012-01-12 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Document: DE 69634642

- Effective date: 20111117

2010-04-30 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20091201

2006-04-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060123

2006-03-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-11-09 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051109

2005-05-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69634642 P 20050525

2005-04-20 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 0774868 P

2005-04-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2005-04-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-01-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021212

2002-11-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2002-11-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020829

2002-03-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-05-23 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 774868

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT