Global Patent Index - EP 1102519 A1

EP 1102519 A1 2001-05-23 - Fast locking device,particularly for microwave oven door

Title (en)

Fast locking device,particularly for microwave oven door

Title (de)

Schnellsperrvorrichtung, insbesondere für die Tür eines Mikrowellenofens

Title (fr)

Dispositif de verrouillage rapide, notamment pour porte de four à micro-ondes

Publication

EP 1102519 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00403198 A

Priority

FR 9914367 A

Abstract (en)

A second of two actuating mechanisms (17-19,21,22,25) includes a D.C. electric motor (17) and a transmission system (21-23) to transmit movement to the shaft (19) of the motor of a second locking unit (20). This actuator includes a resetting spring (25). The rapid locking mechanism has a first part (1) on a second part (2) which moves with respect to the first. The mechanism includes a two stable position closing unit (7), and a first actuating unit (6) for bringing the closing unit (4) from its first to second stable position, when the part is brought to an open position with respect to the second part. The actuating unit also brings the closing unit from its second to its first stable position when the first part is brought to its closed position with respect to the second. The locking unit (5) unit includes. (a) a first locking piece (12) on the closing unit; (b) a second locking part (20) mounted so that it moves on the unit (5) from an open position to a locking position and vice versa. The first and second locking parts are arranged to cooperate and maintain the closing unit in its second stable position when the first part is in its closed position with respect to the second part and the locking piece is in the locked position; (c) second actuating means (17-19,21,22,25) for displacing the second locking piece between its open and locking positions, and; (d) a control unit (28) to control the second actuating means Independent claims are also included for (a) the microwave oven, and (b) the method for rapid locking.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne un dispositif de verrouillage rapide d'une première pièce (1) sur une deuxième pièce (2), comprenant une unité de fermeture (7) à deux positions de butée stables, et des premiers moyens d'actionnement (6) pour amener l'unité de fermeture (4) d'une position stable à l'autre lorsque la première pièce (1) est déplacée par rapport à la deuxième pièce (2). Ce dispositif comprend en outre une unité de verrouillage (5) comportant un premier organe de verrouillage (12) sur l'unité de fermeture (4) et un deuxième organe de verrouillage (20) monté de façon mobile sur l'unité de verrouillage (5), agencés pour coopérer au maintien de l'unité de fermeture (4) dans sa deuxième position, des deuxièmes moyens d'actionnement (17-19, 21, 22, 25), par exemple un moto-réducteur à courant continu, pour déplacer le deuxième organe de verrouillage (20) entre ses positions d'ouverture et de verrouillage, et des moyens de commande (28) pour commander les deuxièmes moyens d'actionnement. Application au verrouillage des portes de fours à micro-ondes. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 6/76

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05B 6/76 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 6/6417 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1102519 A1 20010523; EP 1102519 B1 20050112; DE 60017340 D1 20050217; DE 60017340 T2 20060330; FR 2801096 A1 20010518; FR 2801096 B1 20020111

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071116

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071130

2008-11-14 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080930

2008-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080603

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070122

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-12-07 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20061207

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-11-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061130

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-01-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051013

2005-02-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60017340 P 20050217

2005-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2003-09-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030724

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR IT

2001-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010615

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2001-05-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI