Global Patent Index - EP 1102520 A2

EP 1102520 A2 2001-05-23 - Device for controlling LEDs

Title (en)

Device for controlling LEDs

Title (de)

Anordnung zur Ansteuerung von LEDs

Title (fr)

Dispositif de commande de diodes électroluminescentes

Publication

EP 1102520 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00123897 A

Priority

DE 19954911 A

Abstract (en)

Circuit has an LED (L1-Ln) and a following current limiting resistor (R/n) arranged in alternating sequence in series connection. Node point (K1-Kn) following each resistor, is connected with port output (P1-Pn) of microcontroller (A). Port outputs of microcontroller can be selectively set to high impedance state, clocked output state, supply voltage or ground.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung bezieht sich auf eine stromsparende Anordnung zur Ansteuerung einer Anzahl n von lichtemittierenden Dioden LED (L1 bis Ln). Bei dieser Anordnung sind in abwechselnder Folge jeweils eine LED (L1,L2...Ln) und ein nachgeschalteter Strombegrenzungswiderstand (R/n) in einer Reihenschaltung angeordnet, und die jeweils einem Strombegrenzungswiderstand (R/n) folgenden Knotenpunkte (K1 bis Kn) der Reihenschaltung sind jeweils mit einem Portausgang (P1 bis Pn) einer Ansteuervorrichtung (A) verbunden. Die Portausgänge (P1 bis Pn) der Ansteuervorrichtung (A) sind wahlweise in einen der Zustände (Z(Pi)): hochohmiger Zustand (H), getakteter Ausgang (T, T*), Versorgungsspannung (1 = VDD) oder Masse (0 = GND) schaltbar. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 33/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09G 3/14 (2006.01); H05B 33/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 33/0818 (2013.01); H05B 33/083 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19954911 A1 20010517; EP 1102520 A2 20010523; EP 1102520 A3 20041201

INPADOC legal status


2007-12-05 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070601

2005-08-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR LI

2005-05-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050324

2004-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2004-12-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-10-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ABB PATENT GMBH

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI