Global Patent Index - EP 1102549 A2

EP 1102549 A2 2001-05-30 - NUTRITIONALLY COMPLETE LOW pH ENTERAL FORMULA

Title (en)

NUTRITIONALLY COMPLETE LOW pH ENTERAL FORMULA

Title (de)

NAHRHAFT TOTALE ENTERALE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT EINEM NIEDRIGEN PH-WERT

Title (fr)

FORMULE ENTERALE NUTRITIONNELLE COMPLETE A FAIBLE pH

Publication

EP 1102549 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99920265 A

Priority

  • US 9909606 W
  • US 7452698 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9956563A2] This invention is directed to a low pH nutritional formula that contains high levels of macronutrients, vitamins and minerals. The pH of the enteral formula is from about 3.0-4.6 and delivers at least 25 % of the RDI for selected vitamins and minerals in a 237 ml. serving. The enteral formula uses a stabilizing system comprising a high methoxy pectin to stabilize the protein and a unique process to produce the formula.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A23L 1/29

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A23L 1/29 (2006.01); A23L 1/30 (2006.01); A23L 1/302 (2006.01); A23L 1/304 (2006.01); A23L 1/305 (2006.01); A23L 2/38 (2006.01); A23L 2/66 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A23L 2/66 (2013.01); A23L 2/38 (2013.01); A23L 33/115 (2016.08); A23L 33/15 (2016.08); A23L 33/16 (2016.08); A23L 33/19 (2016.08); A23L 33/40 (2016.08); A23V 2002/00 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. A23V 2002/00 + A23V 2250/628 + A23V 2250/5114 + A23V 2250/5424 + A23V 2250/188 + A23V 2250/032 + A23V 2250/5072 + A23V 2250/0616
  2. A23V 2002/00 + A23V 2250/628 + A23V 2250/5424 + A23V 2250/5072 + A23V 2250/188 + A23V 2250/1944 + A23V 2250/02 + A23V 2250/156 + A23V 2250/51084
  3. A23V 2002/00 + A23V 2250/628 + A23V 2250/5424 + A23V 2250/54246 + A23V 2250/5114 + A23V 2250/5072 + A23V 2250/032 + A23V 2250/5108
  4. A23V 2002/00 + A23V 2250/708 + A23V 2250/704 + A23V 2250/702 + A23V 2250/712 + A23V 2250/71
  5. A23V 2002/00 + A23V 2250/628 + A23V 2250/5118 + A23V 2250/54246 + A23V 2250/188 + A23V 2250/1944 + A23V 2250/54252 + A23V 2250/5072

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9956563A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9956563 A2 19991111; WO 9956563 A3 20010329; AR 015074 A1 20010411; AT 407572 T 20080915; AU 3780599 A 19991123; AU 746236 B2 20020418; BR 9910279 A 20011002; BR 9910279 B1 20130625; CA 2330061 A1 19991111; CA 2330061 C 20080108; CO 5021195 A1 20010327; CY 1108591 T1 20140409; DE 69939542 D1 20081023; DK 1102549 T3 20090112; EP 1102549 A2 20010530; EP 1102549 B1 20080910; ES 2313782 T3 20090301; US 6475539 B1 20021105

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-10 [REG SE ECNC] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS BEEN CANCELLED

2017-08-15 [REG AT MA03] REVOCATION OF THE PATENT

- Document: AT 407572 T

- Effective date: 20170112

2017-05-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160430

2017-05-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160430

2017-05-17 [27W] PATENT REVOKED

- Effective date: 20170112

2017-02-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160501

2017-02-28 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161104

2017-02-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160430

2017-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160430

2017-02-02 [REG GR ML] LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Document: GR 20080403256

- Effective date: 20161104

2017-01-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160430

2017-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160430

2017-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160501

2017-01-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160430

2017-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160430

2017-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161101

2017-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160502

2017-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160430

2017-01-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20161230

2017-01-25 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2016-12-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160430

2016-12-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160430

2016-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 407572 T

- Effective date: 20160430

2016-12-07 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160501

2016-11-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-11-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69939542

2016-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160430

2016-04-13 [RIC2] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A23L 33/00 20160101AFI20160310BHEP

2015-12-16 [REG DE R079] AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS

- Document: DE 69939542

- Free text: PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: A23L0001290000

- IPC: A23L0033000000

2015-11-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20150408

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150415

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150325

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20150325

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150410

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150429

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20150407

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20150402

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-31 [PGFP CY] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Payment date: 20150319

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20150428

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20150421

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-05-29 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20150330

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-05-29 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20150417

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150325

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-04-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20150325

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-04-30 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20150327

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-03-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-07-15 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: NEW ADDRESS: HOLBEINSTRASSE 36-38, 4051 BASEL (CH)

2012-10-10 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: NESTEC S.A.

- Effective date: 20090610

2009-10-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: NESTEC S.A.

2009-07-22 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: NESTEC S.A.

- Effective date: 20090610

2009-05-29 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090210

2009-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2313782 T3

2009-01-12 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2009-01-07 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2008-12-19 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20080403256

2008-10-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOHEST AG

2008-10-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69939542 P 20081023

2008-10-15 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2008-09-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2008-09-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2008-09-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: RO SI

2008-09-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-01-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031127

2001-05-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001106

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: RO PAYMENT 20001106;SI PAYMENT 20001106