Global Patent Index - EP 1102591 A2

EP 1102591 A2 2001-05-30 - COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING PHYTOSTEROL, PHYTOSTANOL OR MIXTURES OF BOTH AND OMEGA-3 FATTY ACIDS OR DERIVATIVES THEREOF AND USE OF THE COMPOSITION IN TREATING OR PREVENTING CARDIOVASCULAR DISEASE AND OTHER DISORDERS

Title (en)

COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING PHYTOSTEROL, PHYTOSTANOL OR MIXTURES OF BOTH AND OMEGA-3 FATTY ACIDS OR DERIVATIVES THEREOF AND USE OF THE COMPOSITION IN TREATING OR PREVENTING CARDIOVASCULAR DISEASE AND OTHER DISORDERS

Title (de)

ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ENTHALTEND PHYTOSTEROL, PHYTOSTANOL ODER MISCHUNGEN VON BEIDEN UND OMEGA-3 FETTSÄURE ODER DERIVATE DAVON UND VERWENDUNG DER ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG ODER VERHINDERUNG VON KARDIOVASKULÄRE ODER ANDERE ERKRANKUNGEN

Title (fr)

COMPOSITIONS A BASE DE PHYTOSTEROL, PHYTOSTANOL OU DE MELANGE DES DEUX, ET D'ACIDES GRAS $g(V)-3 OU DE CERTAINS DE LEURS DERIVES, UTILISATION PREVENTIVE OU CURATIVE DE CETTE COMPOSITION CONTRE DES AFFECTIONS CARDIO-VASCULAIRES ET AUTRES TROUBLES

Publication

EP 1102591 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99932570 A

Priority

  • CA 9900655 W
  • US 11880998 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0004887A2] A composition for use in preventing and treating cardiovascular disease and other disorders comprises one or more phytosterols, phytostanols or mixtures of both, and one or more omega-3 polyunsaturated fatty acids or derivatives thereof.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 31/575; A23L 1/30; A61P 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A23L 1/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A23L 33/11 (2016.08)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0004887 A2 20000203; WO 0004887 A3 20000504; AU 4891699 A 20000214; CA 2346881 A1 20000203; EP 1102591 A2 20010530

INPADOC legal status


2015-11-18 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20151002

2015-10-02 [REG DE R003] REFUSAL DECISION NOW FINAL

2013-07-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PHARMACHEM LABORATORIES, INC.

2003-09-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030716

2001-05-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010220

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20010220;LT PAYMENT 20010220;LV PAYMENT 20010220;MK PAYMENT 20010220;RO PAYMENT 20010220;SI PAYMENT 20010220