Global Patent Index - EP 1102623 A2

EP 1102623 A2 2001-05-30 - METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF TEMPLATE-TEXTURED MATERIALS

Title (en)

METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF TEMPLATE-TEXTURED MATERIALS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG TEMPLAT-GEPRÄGTER MATERIALIEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE MATIERES A IMPRESSION DE MATRICES

Publication

EP 1102623 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99952287 A

Priority

  • DE 9902429 W
  • DE 19836180 A
  • DE 19855290 A
  • DE 19936992 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0007702A2] The invention relates to template-textured materials in the form of template-textured polymers (TGP) on various surfaces including membranes (TGM template-textured membranes). Said materials are created by modifying the surface of solid carriers, which, by cross-linking polymerization of functional monomers initiated on the surface of said solid carriers in the presence of a template, leads to stable template prints that subsequently bind template molecules or template derivatives in a specific manner. The invention also relates to methods for the production of TGPs and to the use thereof for substance-specific separation of materials.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01D 69/02; B01D 67/00; B01J 20/00; C12N 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01D 15/08 (2006.01); B01D 61/24 (2006.01); B01D 61/42 (2006.01); B01D 67/00 (2006.01); B01D 69/02 (2006.01); B01J 20/00 (2006.01); B01J 20/26 (2006.01); B01J 20/28 (2006.01); C08F 2/46 (2006.01); C08F 20/10 (2006.01); C08G 63/48 (2006.01); C12N 11/00 (2006.01); G01N 30/00 (2006.01); G01N 33/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01J 20/26 (2013.01); B01J 20/265 (2013.01); B01J 20/267 (2013.01); B01J 20/268 (2013.01); B01J 20/28016 (2013.01); B01J 20/28021 (2013.01); B01J 20/28023 (2013.01); B01J 20/28033 (2013.01); B01J 20/28078 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0007702A2

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0007702 A2 20000217; WO 0007702 A3 20000420; EP 1102623 A2 20010530; EP 1102623 B1 20110302; US 6670427 B1 20031230

INPADOC legal status


2015-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140901

2015-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140802

2015-07-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140831

2015-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150303

2015-06-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59915253

- Effective date: 20150303

2015-05-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140802

2015-05-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140803

2015-05-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150430

2015-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140831

2015-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140831

2015-04-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140802

2015-04-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 499981 T

- Effective date: 20140802

2015-03-31 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2015-03-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2015-03-30 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20140831

2015-03-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59915253

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20131030

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-11-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130823

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-11-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130820

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20130826

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-10-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20130821

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-10-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20130822

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-10-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20130819

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-05-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110802

2012-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110831

2012-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110302

2012-03-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110831

2012-03-29 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 59915253

- Effective date: 20111205

2012-02-29 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: POLYAN G.- ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON POLYMEREN FUR SPEZ

- Effective date: 20110831

2012-02-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20111205

2011-10-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110302

2011-10-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110704

2011-09-28 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2011-08-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110302

2011-08-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110302

2011-08-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110302

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110613

2011-07-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110603

2011-07-06 [REG NL VDEP] INVALID IN THE NETHERLANDS AS NO TRANSLATION HAS BEEN FILED

- Effective date: 20110302

2011-06-27 [REG DK T3] EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS

2011-06-21 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2011-06-15 [RIN2] INVENTOR CHANGED AFTER GRANT

- Inventor name: ULBRICHT, MATHIAS

2011-06-15 [RIN2] INVENTOR CHANGED AFTER GRANT

- Inventor name: PILETSKY, SERGEY

2011-06-15 [RIN2] INVENTOR CHANGED AFTER GRANT

- Inventor name: SCHEDLER, UWE

2011-06-15 [RIN2] INVENTOR CHANGED AFTER GRANT

- Inventor name: MATUSCHEWSKI, HEIKE

2011-05-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE SCHAAD, BALASS, MENZL & PARTNER AG

2011-04-14 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 59915253

- Effective date: 20110414

2011-04-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59915253 P 20110414

2011-03-30 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2011-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2011-03-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2011-03-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2010-10-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ULBRICHT, MATHIAS

2010-10-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: PILETSKI, SERGIY

2010-10-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SCHEDLER, UWE

2010-10-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MATUSCHEWSKI, HEIKE

2010-05-26 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF TEMPLATE-TEXTURED MATERIALS

2007-06-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070516

2001-05-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010302

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE