Global Patent Index - EP 1102627 A1

EP 1102627 A1 2001-05-30 - PROTECTIVE REFRACTORY SHIELD FOR A GASIFIER

Title (en)

PROTECTIVE REFRACTORY SHIELD FOR A GASIFIER

Title (de)

FEUERFESTE SCHUTZABSCHIRMUNG FÜR VERGASER

Title (fr)

BOUCLIER REFRACTAIRE DE PROTECTION POUR GAZEIFICATEUR

Publication

EP 1102627 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99937671 A

Priority

  • US 9917320 W
  • US 12881798 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0007713A1] The protective refractory shield (10) for a gasifier includes a refractory attachment (70, 140) that is mechanically secured to a protectable surface (60) of the gasifier. The refractory attachment (70, 140) includes a plurality of attachment members (70, 140) of predetermined angular sector. The refractory attachment (70, 140) is provided to cover a downwardly facing horizontal surface (60) of the gasifier or to be positioned upon a vertical surface thereof. Latching means for the attachment include a projecting formation that projects from the protectable surface (60) that engages a complementary shaped recess in the attachment (70, 140) to mechanically secure the attachment to the protectable surface (60). The latching means do not form recesses in the protectable surface (60) nor do the refractory attachments (70, 140) form recesses in the protectable surface (60). Thus the integrity of the protectable surface (60) is maintained while it is protected.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01J 7/00; C10B 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01J 7/00 (2006.01); F23K 3/00 (2006.01); B01J 19/26 (2006.01); C10B 1/00 (2006.01); C10J 3/02 (2006.01); C10J 3/46 (2006.01); C10J 3/50 (2006.01); F23D 14/76 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23D 14/76 (2013.01); B01J 7/00 (2013.01); B01J 19/26 (2013.01); C10J 3/506 (2013.01); C10J 3/74 (2013.01); F23D 14/78 (2013.01); B01J 2219/0009 (2013.01); B01J 2219/00094 (2013.01); B01J 2219/00119 (2013.01); C10J 2200/152 (2013.01); F23D 2900/00018 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0007713 A1 20000217; AT 488296 T 20101215; AU 5245999 A 20000228; AU 736311 B2 20010726; CA 2339468 A1 20000217; CA 2339468 C 20030909; CN 1110358 C 20030604; CN 1311712 A 20010905; DE 69942949 D1 20101230; EP 1102627 A1 20010530; EP 1102627 A4 20081231; EP 1102627 B1 20101117; JP 2002522733 A 20020723; TW 497989 B 20020811; US 6228224 B1 20010508

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160722

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-05-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110728

2012-07-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110728

2012-06-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110728

2012-05-10 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69942949

- Effective date: 20120201

2012-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110731

2012-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110731

2012-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120201

2012-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110801

2012-04-25 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2012-04-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120330

2012-03-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110728

2012-02-29 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110731

2012-02-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2011-12-15 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 69942949

- Effective date: 20110818

2011-10-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20110818

2011-08-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20101117

2011-07-29 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20101117

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110228

2011-06-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110218

2011-05-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20101117

2011-05-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20101117

2011-05-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20101117

2011-05-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20101117

2011-05-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20110317

2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20101117

2011-03-09 [REG NL VDEP] INVALID IN THE NETHERLANDS AS NO TRANSLATION HAS BEEN FILED

- Effective date: 20101117

2010-12-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69942949 P 20101230

2010-12-22 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2010-11-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2010-11-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2010-11-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2009-06-17 [R17C] DATE OF DESPATCH OF FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090515

2009-05-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090407

2008-12-31 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20081128

2008-12-31 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F23D 14/76 20060101ALI20081124BHEP

2008-12-31 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C10B 1/00 20060101ALI20081124BHEP

2008-12-31 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B01J 7/00 20060101AFI20000225BHEP

2001-05-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010110

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI