Global Patent Index - EP 1102637 A1

EP 1102637 A1 2001-05-30 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR ADJUSTING THE LIQUID CONTENT OF A SOLID WITHDRAWN FROM A SELF-DISCHARGING CENTRIFUGAL DRUM OF A SEPARATOR

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR ADJUSTING THE LIQUID CONTENT OF A SOLID WITHDRAWN FROM A SELF-DISCHARGING CENTRIFUGAL DRUM OF A SEPARATOR

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM EINSTELLEN DES FLÜSSIGKEITSGEHALTS DES AUS EINER SELBSTENTLEERENDEN SCHLEUDERTROMMEL EINES SEPARATORS AUSGETRAGENEN FESTSTOFFES

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR AJUSTER LA TENEUR EN LIQUIDE DE LA MATIERE SOLIDE EXTRAITE D'UN PANIER CENTRIFUGE A VIDAGE AUTOMATIQUE D'UN SEPARATEUR

Publication

EP 1102637 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99934572 A

Priority

  • DE 19835120 A
  • EP 9904663 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19835120C1] According to the invention, prior to withdrawal of a solid from a centrifugal drum (1) the liquid content determining the consistency of said solid is to be adjusted. To this end, the separator is brought to a halt before the solid is discharged from the centrifugal drum (1) and the liquid remaining inside the centrifugal drum is aspirated until a quantity remains which corresponds to the required consistency of the solid. Thereafter, the centrifugal drum is emptied at a suitable speed of rotation. The above method can be used with separation techniques in which a substance is separated into solid and liquid phases by centrifugal action.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B04B 1/08; B04B 11/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B04B 1/08 (2006.01); B04B 7/08 (2006.01); B04B 11/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B04B 11/04 (2013.01); B04B 1/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0007733A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19835120 C1 19991021; AT 258464 T 20040215; DK 1102637 T3 20040405; EP 1102637 A1 20010530; EP 1102637 B1 20040128; JP 2002522205 A 20020723; JP 3448565 B2 20030922; US 6468198 B1 20021022; WO 0007733 A1 20000217

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170726

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170725

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170727

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160725

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20160725

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040628

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *WESTFALIA SEPARATOR A.G.

- Effective date: 20040731

2005-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *WESTFALIA SEPARATOR A.G.

- Effective date: 20040731

2005-01-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041029

2004-11-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-08-25 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040731

2004-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040731

2004-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040731

2004-07-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040731

2004-07-05 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040705

2004-07-05 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040705

2004-07-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2004-05-09 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040509

2004-05-04 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-04-28 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040428

2004-04-05 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2004-03-17 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040220

2004-03-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59908431 P 20040304

2004-02-25 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-01-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-01-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-01-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-01-28 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040128

2004-01-28 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040128

2004-01-28 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040128

2004-01-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040128

2004-01-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040128

2001-05-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001214

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE