Global Patent Index - EP 1102719 B1

EP 1102719 B1 2002-09-04 - STOWABLE SPIGOT

Title (en)

STOWABLE SPIGOT

Title (de)

VERSENKBARER ZAPFHAHN

Title (fr)

CANNELLE ESCAMOTABLE

Publication

EP 1102719 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99936566 A

Priority

  • DE 19835569 A
  • EP 9905125 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19835569A1] The present invention relates to a stowable spigot for beverage cans (3) that comprises an outer sleeve (4) with an arrester mechanism for insertion into the opening of the can. The outer sleeve (4) comprises a sliding inner sleeve (8) that supports a gripping member (9) located outside the can. A plug (10) formed at the inner end of the sleeve is sealed with a protection cap (11) located on the outer sleeve when the inner sleeve is fully introduced into the outer sleeve. Once the outer sleeve is removed, the protection cap uncovers a channel (12) formed therein. The inner sleeve further includes a push-valve (14) having a drain hole (29) associated therewith. The sleeves are interconnected through a cam (19) and through a curvilinear slot (20) for driving the inner sleeve towards the outside upon rotation of the gripping member. The outer sleeve comprises a draw hole which is located below and is closed by an insert. The draw hole is located adjacent to the abutment, while the insert can be ejected by the cam.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B67D 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B67D 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B67D 3/043 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19835569 A1 20000217; DE 19835569 C2 20000608; AT 223351 T 20020915; AU 5161299 A 20000228; CA 2338468 A1 20000217; CA 2338468 C 20070807; CZ 20004934 A3 20011212; CZ 297487 B6 20061213; DE 59902588 D1 20021010; DK 1102719 T3 20021209; EP 1102719 A1 20010530; EP 1102719 B1 20020904; ES 2183591 T3 20030316; PL 191042 B1 20060331; PL 345799 A1 20020102; PT 1102719 E 20030131; RU 2238238 C2 20041020; US 6401989 B1 20020611; WO 0007927 A1 20000217

INPADOC legal status


2018-01-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160731

2017-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170719

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170720

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170724

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-08-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160719

2017-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160719

2017-07-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160719

2017-04-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160731

2017-04-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160801

2017-04-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160731

2017-03-22 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160719

2017-03-01 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160801

2017-02-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2017-02-20 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20170131

2016-12-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160731

2016-07-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-06-17 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59902588

- Representative's name: MEPAT PATENTANWAELTE, DR. MEHL-MIKUS, GOY, DR., DE

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150728

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20150723

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20150727

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150723

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20150723

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150724

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-09-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20150723

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-08-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20150723

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-07-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130719

2014-06-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140120

2014-05-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140204

2014-05-30 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130719

2014-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130720

2014-04-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130719

2014-04-23 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2014-04-04 [REG GR ML] LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Document: GR 20020404147

- Effective date: 20140204

2014-03-04 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2014-02-28 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130731

2014-01-28 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20140120

2013-01-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20120119

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-11-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20120725

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-10-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20120720

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-10-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20120720

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-10-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20120723

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-10-31 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20120723

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-02-28 [PGFP CY] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Payment date: 20100709

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-08-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: GRITTMANN, GUENTER

- Free text: GRITTMANN, GUENTER#RINGSTRASSE 6#75031 EPPINGEN-MUEHLBACH (DE) -TRANSFER TO- GRITTMANN, GUENTER#RINGSTRASSE 6#75031 EPPINGEN-MUEHLBACH (DE)

2003-08-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030605

2003-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2183591 T3

2003-02-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-02-04 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20020404147

2003-01-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20021129

2002-12-09 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-10-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59902588 20021010

2002-10-02 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2002-09-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE FELDMANN & PARTNER AG

2002-09-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020904

2002-09-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 223351 T 20020915

2001-11-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010924

2001-05-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001207

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE