Global Patent Index - EP 1102748 A1

EP 1102748 A1 2001-05-30 - NEW 4-AMINO-1-ARYL-PYRIDINE-2-ONES WITH ANTICONVULSIVE ACTION AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME

Title (en)

NEW 4-AMINO-1-ARYL-PYRIDINE-2-ONES WITH ANTICONVULSIVE ACTION AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME

Title (de)

NEUE, ANTIKONVULSIV WIRKENDE 4-AMINO-1-ARYL-PYRIDIN-2-ONE UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG

Title (fr)

NOUVELLE 4-AMINO-1-ARYL-PYRIDINE-2-ONE A PROPRIETES ANTICONVULSIVANTES ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION

Publication

EP 1102748 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99941472 A

Priority

  • DE 19835918 A
  • EP 9905399 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19835918A1] The invention relates to new 4-amino-1-aryl-pyridine-2-ones of formula (1), where n = 0, 1, 2, 3, 4, 5 and X is hydrogen, C1-C4-alkyl, C1-C4-alkoxy, trifluoromethyl, trifluoromethoxy or halogen and A is amino, C1-C4-alkylamino, C1-C4-dialkylamino, morpholino, piperidino or pyrrolidino. The invention also relates to a method for producing same and to their use as medicines, notably for the treatment of different forms of epilepsy.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07D 213/73; A61K 31/4412; C07D 213/74

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/4412 (2006.01); A61K 31/4418 (2006.01); A61K 31/4425 (2006.01); A61P 25/08 (2006.01); C07B 61/00 (2006.01); C07D 213/73 (2006.01); C07D 213/74 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 213/73 (2013.01); C07D 213/74 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0007988A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19835918 A1 20000210; AR 021186 A1 20020703; AU 5507499 A 20000228; BG 105196 A 20011231; BR 9912849 A 20010508; CA 2279692 A1 20000207; CA 2279692 C 20031007; CN 1322197 A 20011114; EP 1102748 A1 20010530; HU 0103204 A2 20020429; HU 0103204 A3 20020628; IL 141200 D0 20020210; JP 2002522420 A 20020723; NO 20010575 A 20010404; NO 20010575 D0 20010202; NZ 509914 A 20021126; PL 346013 A1 20020114; RU 2001106634 A 20040227; SK 2002001 A3 20020107; TR 200100370 T2 20010821; US 6071911 A 20000606; WO 0007988 A1 20000217; ZA 200100999 B 20011214

INPADOC legal status


2008-03-07 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1033942

2005-08-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050201

2004-03-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ELBION AG

2004-01-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ELBION AG

2002-08-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LANKAU, HANS-JOACHIM

2002-08-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: UNVERFERTH, KLAUS

2002-08-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ARNOLD, THOMAS

2002-08-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BARTSCH, RENI

2002-08-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ROSTOCK, ANGELIKA

2002-08-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GRANIK, VLADIMIR

2002-08-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GRIZIK, SOFIA

2001-06-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LANKAU, HANS-JOACHIM

2001-06-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: UNVERFERTH, KLAUS

2001-06-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ARNOLD, THOMAS

2001-06-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BARTSCH, RENI

2001-06-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ROSTOCK, ANGELIKA

2001-06-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GRANIK, VLADIMIR

2001-06-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GRIZIK, SOFIA

2001-05-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010205

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 20010205;LV PAYMENT 20010205;MK PAYMENT 20010205;RO PAYMENT 20010205;SI PAYMENT 20010205