Global Patent Index - EP 1102830 A1

EP 1102830 A1 2001-05-30 - WATER-MISCIBLE COOLING LUBRICANT CONCENTRATE

Title (en)

WATER-MISCIBLE COOLING LUBRICANT CONCENTRATE

Title (de)

WASSERMISCHBARES KÜHLSCHMIERSTOFF-KONZENTRAT

Title (fr)

REFRIGERANT LUBRIFIANT CONCENTRE MISCIBLE A L'EAU

Publication

EP 1102830 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99927938 A

Priority

  • DE 19833894 A
  • EP 9903990 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19833894A1] The invention relates to a water-miscible cooling lubricant concentrate which contains natural or synthetic mineral oils, emulsifiers, anti-corrosive agents, solubility promoters, preservatives, metal inhibitors and other standard additives and after dilution to an aqueous solution containing between 2 and 25 percent by weight has a pH between 7.0 and 7.5. As preservative and/or anti-corrosive agent said concentrate further contains a mixture of a) a reaction product of boric acid and a primary or tertiary alkanolamine and/or, b) an ethoxylated and/or propoxylated fatty acid or a fatty acid alkanolamide and at least one other compound selected from the group consisting of c) a carboxylic acid imide, a phosphoric acid ester, a triazole, a thiadiazole, an isothiazolinone, an imidazole, a guanidine, an aromatic carboxylic acid and 3-iod-2-propinyl-carbamate, and/or d) a methylol urea derivative.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10M 173/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10M 101/02 (2006.01); C10M 105/32 (2006.01); C10M 107/08 (2006.01); C10M 107/34 (2006.01); C10M 107/42 (2006.01); C10M 129/06 (2006.01); C10M 129/08 (2006.01); C10M 129/44 (2006.01); C10M 129/48 (2006.01); C10M 133/16 (2006.01); C10M 133/20 (2006.01); C10M 133/22 (2006.01); C10M 133/38 (2006.01); C10M 133/44 (2006.01); C10M 133/46 (2006.01); C10M 135/10 (2006.01); C10M 135/18 (2006.01); C10M 135/36 (2006.01); C10M 139/00 (2006.01); C10M 173/00 (2006.01); C10N 30/00 (2006.01); C10N 30/12 (2006.01); C10N 30/14 (2006.01); C10N 30/16 (2006.01); C10N 30/18 (2006.01); C10N 40/22 (2006.01); C10N 40/24 (2006.01); C10N 50/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10M 173/00 (2013.01); C10M 129/06 (2013.01); C10M 129/60 (2013.01); C10M 133/08 (2013.01); C10M 133/16 (2013.01); C10M 133/38 (2013.01); C10M 135/10 (2013.01); C10M 139/00 (2013.01); C10M 145/28 (2013.01); C10M 145/30 (2013.01); C10M 145/32 (2013.01); C10M 145/36 (2013.01); C10M 2201/02 (2013.01); C10M 2201/087 (2013.01); C10M 2207/021 (2013.01); C10M 2207/18 (2013.01); C10M 2207/281 (2013.01); C10M 2207/282 (2013.01); C10M 2207/283 (2013.01); C10M 2207/286 (2013.01); C10M 2209/104 (2013.01); C10M 2209/105 (2013.01); C10M 2209/106 (2013.01); C10M 2209/107 (2013.01); C10M 2209/108 (2013.01); C10M 2215/042 (2013.01); C10M 2215/08 (2013.01); C10M 2215/082 (2013.01); C10M 2215/086 (2013.01); C10M 2215/12 (2013.01); C10M 2215/122 (2013.01); C10M 2215/22 (2013.01); C10M 2215/28 (2013.01); C10M 2219/044 (2013.01); C10M 2227/00 (2013.01); C10M 2227/06 (2013.01); C10M 2227/061 (2013.01); C10M 2227/062 (2013.01); C10M 2227/063 (2013.01); C10M 2227/065 (2013.01); C10M 2227/066 (2013.01); C10N 2250/02 (2013.01); C10N 2270/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0006675A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19833894 A1 20000203; AU 4510699 A 20000221; BR 9912475 A 20010417; BR 9912475 B1 20130604; EP 1102830 A1 20010530; EP 1102830 B1 20041229; ES 2235490 T3 20050701; HK 1038375 A1 20050318; JP 2002521555 A 20020716; JP 4084927 B2 20080430; KR 100451979 B1 20041008; US 6511946 B1 20030128; WO 0006675 A1 20000210

INPADOC legal status


2018-06-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170703

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170829

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170622

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170626

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170621

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-06-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-09-28 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: RHENUS LUB GMBH & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20050929

2016-06-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-11-14 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: FUCHS PETROLUB SE, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: FUCHS PETROLUB AG, 68169 MANNHEIM, DE

- Document: DE 59911375

- Effective date: 20130924

2013-11-14 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59911375

- Representative's name: MUELLER SCHUPFNER & PARTNER PATENT- UND RECHTS, DE

- Effective date: 20130924

2013-10-30 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: FUCHS PETROLUB SE

2013-09-24 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59911375

- Representative's name: MUELLER SCHUPFNER & PARTNER PATENT- UND RECHTS, DE

2008-03-26 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: RHENUS LUB GMBH & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20050929

2005-12-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-11-23 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: RHENUS LUB GMBH & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20050929

2005-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2235490 T3

2005-04-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050401

2005-03-18 [REG HK GR] STANDARD PATENTS GRANTED IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1038375

2005-02-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59911375 P 20050203

2004-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-12-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-11-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010928

2001-05-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001130

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT