Global Patent Index - EP 1102859 A1

EP 1102859 A1 2001-05-30 - METHOD FOR OBTAINING FATTY ACIDS FROM BIOMASS BY COMBINED $i(IN-SITU) EXTRACTION, REACTION AND CHROMATOGRAPHY USING COMPRESSED GASES

Title (en)

METHOD FOR OBTAINING FATTY ACIDS FROM BIOMASS BY COMBINED $i(IN-SITU) EXTRACTION, REACTION AND CHROMATOGRAPHY USING COMPRESSED GASES

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR PRÄPARATIVEN GEWINNUNG VON FETTSÄUREN AUS BIOMASSE DURCH $i(IN- SITU)-EXTRAKTION-REAKTION-CHROMATOGRAPHIE MIT VERDICHTETEN GASEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE PREPARATION D'ACIDES GRAS A PARTIR DE BIOMASSE PAR CHROMATOGRAPHIE COUPLEE AVEC DES TRANSFORMATIONS CHIMIQUES PAR EXTRACTION $I(IN SITU) AVEC DES GAZ COMPRIMES

Publication

EP 1102859 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99938281 A

Priority

  • DE 19832784 A
  • DE 19906474 A
  • EP 9905107 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0005395A1] The invention relates to a method for obtaining fatty acid esters and fatty acids, preferably unsaturated fatty acid ethyl esters, from biological sources by continuous, combined in-situ extraction, reaction and chromatography. The invention is characterized in that simultaneously and in the same location, in the presence of a compressed gas and an 0.5 - 5 % stream of lower alcohols as modifiers and in the presence of an inert catalyst, the fatty acids are fully transesterified from their native fatty acid sources, which are selectively desorbed and eluated in the conditions specified above.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12P 7/64; C12P 7/62

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A23L 1/00 (2006.01); A23L 1/03 (2006.01); A23L 1/30 (2006.01); A61K 31/22 (2006.01); A61K 31/23 (2006.01); A61K 35/66 (2006.01); C11B 1/10 (2006.01); C11B 3/10 (2006.01); C11B 7/00 (2006.01); C11C 3/10 (2006.01); C12P 7/64 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11C 3/003 (2013.01); A23L 33/12 (2016.08); A61K 31/23 (2013.01); B01D 15/08 (2013.01); C11B 1/104 (2013.01); C11B 7/005 (2013.01); C11C 3/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0005395 A1 20000203; EP 1102859 A1 20010530; JP 2002521030 A 20020716; NO 20010276 A 20010320; NO 20010276 D0 20010117; US 6350890 B1 20020226

INPADOC legal status


2004-11-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040511

2004-02-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031229

2002-11-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NUTRINOVA NUTRITION SPECIALTIES & FOOD INGREDIENTS

2002-05-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CELANESE VENTURES GMBH

2001-05-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010222

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI