Global Patent Index - EP 1102875 A2

EP 1102875 A2 2001-05-30 - ALKALI ZINC NICKEL BATH

Title (en)

ALKALI ZINC NICKEL BATH

Title (de)

ALKALISCHES ZINK-NICKELBAD

Title (fr)

BAIN ALCALIN DE ZINC-NICKEL

Publication

EP 1102875 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99940077 A

Priority

  • DE 19834353 A
  • EP 9905443 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19834353A1] The anode is separated from the alkaline electrode to avoid undesirable secondary reactions in an alkali zinc nickel electroplating bath.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C25D 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C25D 17/00 (2006.01); C25D 3/56 (2006.01); C25D 17/10 (2006.01); C25D 21/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C25D 3/565 (2013.01); C25D 21/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0006807A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19834353 A1 20000203; DE 19834353 C2 20000817; AT 242821 T 20030615; AT 346180 T 20061215; AU 5415299 A 20000221; BG 105184 A 20011031; BR 9912589 A 20010502; CA 2339144 A1 20000210; CN 1311830 A 20010905; CZ 20010189 A3 20010815; CZ 298904 B6 20080305; DE 59914011 D1 20070104; EE 200100059 A 20021015; EP 1102875 A2 20010530; EP 1102875 B1 20030611; EP 1344850 A1 20030917; EP 1344850 B1 20061122; ES 2201759 T3 20040316; ES 2277624 T3 20070716; HR P20010044 A2 20011231; HR P20010044 B1 20050630; HU 0103951 A2 20020228; HU 0103951 A3 20030528; IL 141086 D0 20020210; JP 2002521572 A 20020716; JP 2008150713 A 20080703; JP 4716568 B2 20110706; MX PA01000932 A 20020604; PL 198149 B1 20080530; PL 345970 A1 20020114; SK 285453 B6 20070104; SK 892001 A3 20011008; TR 200100232 T2 20010621; US 2004104123 A1 20040603; US 2008164150 A1 20080710; US 2011031127 A1 20110210; US 6602394 B1 20030805; US 7807035 B2 20101005; US 8486235 B2 20130716; WO 0006807 A2 20000210; WO 0006807 A3 20000504

INPADOC legal status


2013-03-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 242821 T

- Effective date: 20120729

2012-11-06 [REG SE ECNC] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS BEEN CANCELLED

2012-08-16 [REG DE R107] PUBLICATION OF GRANT OF EUROPEAN PATENT RESCINDED

- Document: DE 59905937

- Effective date: 20120816

2012-06-20 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20120504

2012-06-20 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Effective date: 20120504

2012-05-04 [REG DE R064] EPO'S REVOCATION DECISION NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 59905937

2012-05-04 [REG DE R103] PATENT REVOKED BY EPO

- Document: DE 59905937

2011-12-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110727

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-12-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20110725

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-12-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20110725

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20110720

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20110721

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110721

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110926

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-11-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20110728

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110729

- Year of fee payment: 13

2004-07-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: COVENTYA SAS

2004-07-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: ENTHONE GMBH

2004-07-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: ZENO DATENVERARBEITUNGS GMBH

2004-05-06 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: COVENTYA SAS

- Effective date: 20040308

2004-05-06 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: ENTHONE GMBH

- Effective date: 20040311

2004-05-06 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: ZENO DATENVERARBEITUNGS GMBH

- Effective date: 20040311

2004-04-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2201759 T3

2004-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-01-28 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2003-11-25 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20030611

2003-10-01 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-09-11 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030911

2003-09-11 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030911

2003-09-11 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030911

2003-09-02 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-29 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030729

2003-07-29 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030729

2003-07-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59905937 P 20030717

2003-07-09 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-06-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-06-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-06-11 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030611

2003-06-11 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030611

2002-09-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020718

2001-05-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010227

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO PAYMENT 20010227;SI PAYMENT 20010227