Global Patent Index - EP 1102884 A1

EP 1102884 A1 2001-05-30 - COARSE DIRT COLLECTOR FOR REMOVING COARSE MATERIAL FROM A PULPER AND CORRESPONDING METHOD

Title (en)

COARSE DIRT COLLECTOR FOR REMOVING COARSE MATERIAL FROM A PULPER AND CORRESPONDING METHOD

Title (de)

GROBSCHMUTZFÄNGERVORRICHTUNG ZUM HERAUSHEBEN DER GROBSTOFFE AUS EINEM PULPER UND ENTSRECHENDES ARBEITSVERFAHREN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF COLLECTEUR D'IMPURETES GROSSIERES POUR ENLEVER PAR SOULEVEMENT LES MATIERES GROSSIERES D'UN TRITURATEUR, ET PROCEDE DE TRAVAIL CORRESPONDANT

Publication

EP 1102884 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99929135 A

Priority

  • DE 19829648 A
  • EP 9903853 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0001878A1] The invention relates to a coarse dirt collector (7) for removing coarse material from a pulper (1). The coarse dirt collector (7) comprises a support arm (8) with a collecting basket (9). The collecting basket (9) consists of a frame (11) on which tines (Z) are fixed by means of a grid. The coarse dirt collector can be pivoted into and out of the pulper, to which end it moves about an axis of rotation (A) positioned at an angle to the plane that is perpendicular to the longitudinal axis (P) of the pulper. Said angle is between 20 DEG and 40 DEG . The advantage of said device is that the coarse dirt collector (7) has to carry out only one movement between its collecting and unloading position and unloading can take place automatically without need for a special scraping device. Because of the position of the tines (Z) there is no risk of undesirable loss of coarse material prior to unloading. This minimizes the mechanical and control-engineering related complexity of the device provided for by the invention in relation to the prior art and reduces the raking process cycle time. The coarse dirt collector is constructed such that it has as large a capacity as possible for the collection of coarse material. The coarse dirt collector also makes it possible selectively to remove only light-weight coarse material from the pulper.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21B 1/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21B 1/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21B 1/345 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0001878A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0001878 A1 20000113; AT 233341 T 20030315; BR 9911722 A 20010320; BR 9911722 B1 20090811; CA 2335140 A1 20000113; CA 2335140 C 20070109; CZ 20004878 A3 20010516; CZ 293950 B6 20040818; DE 19829648 A1 20000309; DE 19829648 C2 20000629; EP 1102884 A1 20010530; EP 1102884 B1 20030226; ES 2194474 T3 20031116; JP 2002519535 A 20020702; JP 4601167 B2 20101222; PL 190330 B1 20051130; PL 345491 A1 20011217; PT 1102884 E 20030731; US 7169263 B1 20070130

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170602

2018-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170602

2018-03-21 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2018-02-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20170602

2017-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170703

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170626

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170622

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150630

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170621

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-06-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-02-28 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161202

2016-07-29 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20160622

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160628

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-06-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150602

2016-04-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150630

2016-04-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150701

2016-04-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150630

2016-03-02 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150701

2016-02-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 233341 T

- Effective date: 20150602

2016-01-29 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150602

2016-01-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2015-07-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20150525

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-10-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20140618

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-08-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20140618

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-08-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20140618

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-08-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20140620

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-08-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20140618

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-07-30 [REG PT PC4A] TRANSFER OF ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: BTA INTERNATIONAL GMBH, DE

- Effective date: 20090115

2009-04-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: BTA INTERNATIONAL GMBH

- Effective date: 20090203

2009-02-28 [BECA] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S ADDRESS

- Owner name: BTA INTERNATIONAL G.M.B.A.LANDSBERGER STRASSE 6, D

- Effective date: 20090219

2009-02-25 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20090129 AND 20090204

2008-04-30 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: BTA INTERNATIONAL GMBH

- Free text: REA GESELLSCHAFT FUER RECYCLING VON ENERGIE UND ABFALL MBH#ROTTMANNSTRASSE 18#80333 MUENCHEN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- BTA INTERNATIONAL GMBH#FAERBERSTRASSE 7#85276 PFAFFENHOFEN AN DER ILM (DE)

2004-02-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031127

2004-01-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040101

2003-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2194474 T3

2003-10-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-06-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-06-17 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20030401895

2003-06-03 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-05-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: HEPP, WENGER & RYFFEL AG

2003-04-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59904383 P 20030403

2003-04-02 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-02-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-02-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2003-02-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-07-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020529

2001-05-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001215

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE