Global Patent Index - EP 1102927 A1

EP 1102927 A1 2001-05-30 - CYLINDER HEAD

Title (en)

CYLINDER HEAD

Title (de)

ZYLINDERKOPF

Title (fr)

CULASSE

Publication

EP 1102927 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99932857 A

Priority

  • DE 19833531 A
  • EP 9904828 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19833531A1] Screw cores are arranged on both sides of the channels for cylinder head fixture screws, which are arranged along the side walls of the cylinder head. At least one side wall (68,70) of the cylinder head (10) between the screw cores (64) is drawn inwards to the cylinder center (22). The adjacent connecting surface (34,46) with its edge contour (74) abutting on the side walls penetrates between the screw cores.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02F 1/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02F 1/42 (2006.01); F02F 1/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02F 1/4214 (2013.01); F02B 2275/18 (2013.01); F02F 2001/245 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0006880A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19833531 A1 20000127; EP 1102927 A1 20010530; EP 1102927 B1 20020320; ES 2172341 T3 20020916; WO 0006880 A1 20000210

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170731

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170726

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170814

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2003-03-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20021223

2002-10-30 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2002-09-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2172341 T3

2002-07-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-04-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59901030 20020425

2002-03-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2002-03-20 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020320

2001-08-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010704

2001-05-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010112

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE