Global Patent Index - EP 1102931 A1

EP 1102931 A1 2001-05-30 - FUEL INJECTION VALVE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME

Title (en)

FUEL INJECTION VALVE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME

Title (de)

BRENNSTOFFEINSPRITZVENTIL UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG

Title (fr)

SOUPAPE D'INJECTION DE CARBURANT ET SON PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION

Publication

EP 1102931 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00909052 A

Priority

  • DE 0000487 W
  • DE 19925984 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19925984A1] A fuel injection valve (100), especially an injection valve for fuel injection systems of internal combustion engines, has a valve-closing body (7) which is activated by means of a valve needle (5). Said valve-closing body interacts with a valve seat surface (6) provided on a valve seat support (1), to form a tight seat. The inventive fuel injection valve also has a valve housing (20), which partially encompasses the valve seat support (1) and which is connected thereto by a bordered connection. The valve seat support (1) is bordered to the valve housing (20) with an axial distortion.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 61/16; F02M 51/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 51/06 (2006.01); F02M 61/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 51/0671 (2013.01); F02M 61/168 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0075503A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19925984 A1 20001214; EP 1102931 A1 20010530; EP 1102931 B1 20050518; JP 2003501584 A 20030114; WO 0075503 A1 20001214

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120901

2012-12-13 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50010343

- Effective date: 20120901

2012-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110228

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110222

2011-11-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20111102

2011-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110421

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100315

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100226

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060221

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070222

2007-10-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070222

2006-05-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060221

2006-03-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-10-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050912

2005-06-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50010343 P 20050623

2005-06-15 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2005-05-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2005-05-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-05-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040322

2001-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010615

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE