Global Patent Index - EP 1102956 A1

EP 1102956 A1 2001-05-30 - METHOD AND INSTALLATION FOR MANAGING SOLID ELEMENTS CIRCULATING IN A HEAT EXCHANGER FOR CLEANING THE LATTER

Title (en)

METHOD AND INSTALLATION FOR MANAGING SOLID ELEMENTS CIRCULATING IN A HEAT EXCHANGER FOR CLEANING THE LATTER

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG VON IN EINEM WÄRMETAUSCHER UMLAUFENDEN FESTEN KÖRPERN ZUR DESSEN REINIGUNG

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET INSTALLATION POUR LA GESTION DES ELEMENTS SOLIDES MIS EN CIRCULATION DANS UN ECHANGEUR DE CHALEUR POUR LE NETTOYAGE DE CELUI-CI

Publication

EP 1102956 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98941555 A

Priority

FR 9801756 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0008404A1] The invention concerns an installation wherein intercepting means (17) are interposed on an outlet pipe (11S) of a heat exchanger (10) for collecting solid cleansing elements (15) circulating therein, whereby said solid cleansing elements (15) are recirculated towards the inlet pipe (11E) of said heat exchanger (10) through a control device (26). The invention is characterised in that it consists in setting between the intercepting means (17) and the control device (26), a concentrating device (27) for raising the concentration level of solid cleansing elements (15) in the return flow, such that the flow rate conditions at the control device (26) inlet correspond to the normal operating conditions thereof. The invention is particularly applicable to tubular heat exchangers forming condensers.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F28G 1/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B08B 9/053 (2006.01); F28G 1/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28G 1/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0008404A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

FR NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 0008404 A1 20000217; DE 19883011 B4 20081127; DE 19883011 T1 20010712; EP 1102956 A1 20010530; EP 1102956 B1 20021113; JP 2002522740 A 20020723; JP 4090199 B2 20080528

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20180430

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160708

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2006-05-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060301

2006-03-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060301

2004-07-22 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20040722

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-11-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030814

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): FR NL

2002-03-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020124

2001-05-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010209

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): FR NL