Global Patent Index - EP 1102968 A1

EP 1102968 A1 2001-05-30 - VIBRATING CONDUIT AND METHODS FOR GENERATING COMPENSATED MASS FLOW ESTIMATES

Title (en)

VIBRATING CONDUIT AND METHODS FOR GENERATING COMPENSATED MASS FLOW ESTIMATES

Title (de)

SCHWINGENDE ROHRLEITUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERZEUGUNG VON KOMPENSIERTEN MASSENDURCHFLUSSSCHÄTZUNGEN

Title (fr)

CONDUIT VIBRANT ET PROCEDES POUR LA GENERATION D'ESTIMATIONS DE DEBIT MASSIQUE COMPENSE

Publication

EP 1102968 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99937251 A

Priority

  • US 9915907 W
  • US 12974698 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0008423A1] A process parameter associated with a material contained in a conduit is estimated by estimating a real normal modal residual flexibility component associated with a real normal mode of motion of the conduit. A plurality of motion signals representing motion of the conduit is received. A residual-flexibility-compensated estimate of mass flow is generated from the received plurality of motion signals and the estimated real normal modal residual flexibility component. Related apparatus and computer program products are also described.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01F 1/84

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01F 1/84 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01F 1/8413 (2013.01); G01F 1/8436 (2013.01); G01F 1/8477 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0008423A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0008423 A1 20000217; AR 016503 A1 20010704; AU 5212699 A 20000228; BR 9912118 A 20010403; CA 2335072 A1 20000217; CN 101424557 A 20090506; CN 101424557 B 20121212; CN 1311853 A 20010905; DE 69907474 D1 20030605; DE 69907474 T2 20031120; EP 1102968 A1 20010530; EP 1102968 B1 20030502; ID 27844 A 20010426; JP 2002522757 A 20020723; JP 3581653 B2 20041027; PL 345656 A1 20020102; US 6272438 B1 20010807

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170727

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170727

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170727

- Year of fee payment: 19

2004-05-07 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-05-05 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2004-04-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040203

2003-10-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-06-11 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2003-06-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69907474 P 20030605

2003-05-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG

2003-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-05-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2003-05-02 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030502

2003-05-02 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030502

2003-05-02 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030502

2001-05-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001219

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE