Global Patent Index - EP 1102991 B1

EP 1102991 B1 2002-11-13 - DIAGNOSTIC ASSAY REQUIRING A SMALL SAMPLE OF BIOLOGICAL FLUID

Title (en)

DIAGNOSTIC ASSAY REQUIRING A SMALL SAMPLE OF BIOLOGICAL FLUID

Title (de)

DIAGNOSTISCHES TESTVERFAHREN FÜR KLEINE PROBENVOLUMINA

Title (fr)

Essai diagnostique necessitant un petit volume d'echantillon de fluide biologique

Publication

EP 1102991 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 99927176 A

Priority

  • US 9912294 W
  • US 9568398 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9964620A2] A multiple-layer element method for monitoring the concentration of glucose in blood. The element comprises: (a) a core layer having two major surfaces, an optical reading chamber extending from a first opening in one of said two major surfaces to a second opening in the other of said two major surfaces, said, core layer further having a third opening therein and a flow channel, one end of which flow channel communicates with the third opening and the other end of which flow channel communicates with the optical reading chamber; and (b) a base layer in face-to-face contact with one major surface of said core layer; and (c) a cover layer in face-to-face contact with the other major surface of said core layer, said cover layer having an opening therein to vent the element. The method involves (a) obtaining a sample of biological fluid, e.g., interstitial fluid, from the body of a patient; (b) introducing the sample to article comprising a multiple-layer element having an optical reading chamber; (c) allowing reagents to react with an analyse of interest in the sample; and (d) measuring the concentration of analyse in the sample by means of an optical instrument.

[origin: WO9964620A2] An article and a method for monitoring the concentration of glucose in blood. In one aspect, the invention involves an article comprising a multiple-layer element utilizing reagents capable of reacting with an analyte of interest. In a prefered embodiment, the element comprises: (a) a core layer having two major surfaces, an optical reading chamber extending from a first opening in one of said two major surfaces to a second opening in the other of said two major surfaces, said core layer further having a third opening therein and a flow channel, one end of which flow channel communicates with the third opening and the other end of which flow channel communicates with the optical reading chamber; and (b) a base layer in face-to-face contact with one major surface of said core layer; and (c) a cover layer in face-to-face contact with the other major surface of said core layer, said cover layer having an opening therein to vent the element. In this embodiment, the optical reading chamber extends completely through the core layer. The sample is introduced into the third opening and then flows through the flow channel into the optical reading chamber. The reagents with which the analyte in the sample reacts to form an optically detectable reaction product can be disposed in the optical reading chamber or can be added to the sample before the sample enters the optical reading chamber. In another aspect, the invention involves a method comprising the steps of: (a) obtaining a sample of biological fluid, e.g., interstitial fluid, from the body of a patient; (b) introducing the sample to article comprising a multiple-layer element having an optical reading chamber; (c) allowing reagents to react with an analyte of interest in the sample; and (d) measuring the concentration of analyte in the sample by means of an optical instrument.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01N 33/543; C12Q 1/54; G01N 33/53

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/52 (2006.01); C12Q 1/32 (2006.01); C12Q 1/54 (2006.01); G01N 33/53 (2006.01); G01N 33/543 (2006.01); G01N 33/66 (2006.01); G01N 37/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/54373 (2013.01); G01N 33/5304 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9964620 A2 19991216; WO 9964620 A3 20010118; AT 227848 T 20021115; AU 4414599 A 19991230; AU 766762 B2 20031023; CA 2334269 A1 19991216; CA 2334269 C 20080819; DE 29924971 U1 20070719; DE 69903954 D1 20021219; DE 69903954 T2 20030904; EP 1102991 A2 20010530; EP 1102991 B1 20021113; ES 2187165 T3 20030516; IT MI20070307 U1 20081211; JP 2003534526 A 20031118; US 6077660 A 20000620

INPADOC legal status


2013-08-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20130618

- Year of fee payment: 15

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070605

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ABBOTT LABORATORIES

- Effective date: 20050630

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070511

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-10-24 [27W] PATENT REVOKED

- Effective date: 20070125

2007-10-24 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Free text: 20070125

2007-08-15 [110E] REQUEST FOR CONVERSION INTO A NATIONAL PATENT APPLICATION

- Effective date: 20070323

2007-06-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070629

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-06-15 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20070615

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-06-14 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: ROCHE DIAGNOSTICS

- Effective date: 20030807

2006-03-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060101

2006-02-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-01-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060101

2005-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-06-03 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050603

2004-06-25 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20040625

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-06-08 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20040608

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-05-10 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20040510

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-05-06 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20040506

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-12-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: ROCHE DIAGNOSTICS

2003-10-22 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: ROCHE DIAGNOSTICS

- Effective date: 20030807

2003-06-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2187165 T3

2003-03-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: A. BRAUN, BRAUN, HERITIER, ESCHMANN AG PATENTANWAE

2002-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69903954 20021219

2002-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2002-11-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-11-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 227848 T 20021115

2002-04-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020312

2001-07-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: WONG, SIE, TING

2001-07-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HILTIBRAN, ROBERT G.

2001-07-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HUANG, TUNG-MING

2001-05-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001212

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL