Global Patent Index - EP 1103004 A1

EP 1103004 A1 2001-05-30 - OBJECT DETECTION SYSTEM

Title (en)

OBJECT DETECTION SYSTEM

Title (de)

OBJEKTDETEKTIONSSYSTEM

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE DETECTION D'OBJET

Publication

EP 1103004 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00943634 A

Priority

  • DE 0001667 W
  • DE 19923920 A
  • DE 19934670 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0073818A1] The invention relates to an object detection system, in particular, for a vehicle. Said object detection system consists of a combination of at least three object detectors, each of which has a different detection area and/or a different detection range.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01S 13/86; G01S 13/93; G01S 17/02; G01S 17/93

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60R 21/00 (2006.01); B60K 31/00 (2006.01); G01S 7/03 (2006.01); G01S 7/497 (2006.01); G01S 13/10 (2006.01); G01S 13/34 (2006.01); G01S 13/86 (2006.01); G01S 13/93 (2006.01); G01S 17/02 (2006.01); G01S 17/89 (2006.01); G01S 17/93 (2006.01); G01S 15/93 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01S 17/936 (2013.01); G01S 7/4972 (2013.01); G01S 13/862 (2013.01); G01S 13/865 (2013.01); G01S 13/867 (2013.01); G01S 13/931 (2013.01); G01S 17/023 (2013.01); G01S 7/497 (2013.01); G01S 15/931 (2013.01); G01S 2013/9321 (2013.01); G01S 2013/9353 (2013.01); G01S 2013/9357 (2013.01); G01S 2013/9375 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0073818A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0073818 A1 20001207; EP 1103004 A1 20010530; JP 2003501635 A 20030114; US 6580385 B1 20030617

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20161201

2007-10-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070905

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-08-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010607

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI