Global Patent Index - EP 1103046 A2

EP 1103046 A2 2001-05-30 - ORGANIC DYE-IN-POLYMER (DIP) MEDIUM FOR WRITE-ONCE-READ-MANY (WORM) OPTICAL DISCS WITH FLUORESCENT READING

Title (en)

ORGANIC DYE-IN-POLYMER (DIP) MEDIUM FOR WRITE-ONCE-READ-MANY (WORM) OPTICAL DISCS WITH FLUORESCENT READING

Title (de)

ORGANISCHES FARBSTOFF-IN -POLYMER (DIP)-MEDIUM FÜR EINMAL BESCHREIBBARE, MEHRMALS LESBARE OPTISCHE PLATTEN ZUM FLUORESZENSLESEN

Title (fr)

MILIEU COLORANT-DANS-POLYMERE (DIP) ORGANIQUE POUR DISQUES OPTIQUES INSCRIPTIBLES UNE SEULE FOIS (WORM) ET A LECTURE FLUORESCENTE

Publication

EP 1103046 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99929620 A

Priority

  • IB 9901266 W
  • US 8533498 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9959142A2] High sensitive organic dye-in-polymer (DIP) medium for write-once-read-many (WORM) optical discs with fluorescent reading. The medium consists of a fluorescent color means, capable of absorbing writing radiation produced by a laser, a compound capable of generating free radicals upon influence of heat produced by the writing radiation and a polymer capable of producing a translucent film enabling high quantum yield of the fluorescence induced in the color means. The color means can be selected from xanthene dyes of the eosine and rhodamine groups, acridine, oxazine, azine, peylene, violanthrone, cyanine, phtalocyanine, indigoide colors and porphyries. The free radicals generating compound can be chosen from the group of compounds comprising azo and diazoi compounds or peroxyde compounds. The film producing polymer can be selected from the group of compounds comprising cellulose ethers, vinyl resins or acrylic resins.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G11B 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41M 5/26 (2006.01); G11B 7/24 (2006.01); G11B 7/244 (2006.01); G11B 7/245 (2006.01); G11B 7/2467 (2013.01); G11B 7/247 (2006.01); G11B 7/2472 (2013.01); G11B 7/26 (2006.01); G11B 7/00 (2006.01); G11B 7/246 (2013.01); G11B 7/253 (2006.01); G11B 7/2531 (2013.01); G11B 7/2533 (2013.01); G11B 7/2534 (2013.01); G11B 7/2535 (2013.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G11B 7/2472 (2013.01); G11B 7/244 (2013.01); G11B 7/245 (2013.01); G11B 7/2467 (2013.01); G11B 7/248 (2013.01); G11B 7/2531 (2013.01); G11B 7/2533 (2013.01); G11B 7/2534 (2013.01); G11B 7/2535 (2013.01); G11B 2007/0013 (2013.01); G11B 2007/24624 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9959142 A2 19991118; WO 9959142 A3 20000629; WO 9959142 A8 20000727; AU 4639899 A 19991129; EP 1103046 A2 20010530; EP 1103046 A4 20030108; JP 2002515353 A 20020528

INPADOC legal status


2003-10-22 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021203

2003-08-27 [32PN] PUBLIC NOTIFICATION

- Free text: EPO FORM 2502B, SENT 23.01.03, "INVITATION TO GIVE NOTICE OF APPOINTMENT OFA PROFESSIONAL REPRESENTATIVE", ADDRESSED TO: OMD DEVICES, LLC. 101

2003-05-07 [32PN] PUBLIC NOTIFICATION

- Free text: NOTING OF LOSS OF RIGHTS (R.69(1)EPC)

2003-01-08 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20021126

2003-01-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-01-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 32B 3/00 A, 7G 11B 7/24 B

2002-05-08 [D18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN (DELETED)

2002-01-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 32B 3/00 A

2001-05-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001130

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE