Global Patent Index - EP 1103047 A1

EP 1103047 A1 2001-05-30 - PRE-ENGRAVED SUBSTRATE FOR MAGNETIC, MAGNETO-OPTICAL OR PHASE TRANSITION OPTICAL DISC, FUNCTIONING BY FIRST SURFACE RECORDING IN THE LANDS, MANUFACTURING METHOD AND RESULTING DISC

Title (en)

PRE-ENGRAVED SUBSTRATE FOR MAGNETIC, MAGNETO-OPTICAL OR PHASE TRANSITION OPTICAL DISC, FUNCTIONING BY FIRST SURFACE RECORDING IN THE LANDS, MANUFACTURING METHOD AND RESULTING DISC

Title (de)

VORGRAVIERTES SUBSTRAT FÜR MAGNETISCHE PLATTEN, MAGNETO-OPTISCHE PLATTEN UND OPTISCHE PLATTEN MIT PHASENWECHSEL ZUR AUFZEICHNUNG AUF DIE STEGE DER ERSTEN OBERFLÄCHE, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN UND DERARTIG HERGESTELLTE PLATTEN

Title (fr)

SUBSTRAT PREGRAVE POUR DISQUE MAGNETIQUE, MAGNETO-OPTIQUE OU OPTIQUE A TRANSITION DE PHASE, FONCTIONNANT PAR ENREGISTREMENT EN PREMIERE SURFACE DANS LES LANDS, SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION ET DISQUE OBTENU

Publication

EP 1103047 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98941545 A

Priority

FR 9801745 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0008643A1] The invention concerns a pre-engraved substrate for a memory disc recordable by magnetic, magneto-optical or phase transition constraint, its manufacturing method and the resulting disc. Said pre-engraved substrate comprises a support (1) having at its surface a surface film (2) in a reflecting material and enabling to obtain a surface with optical polish and at least a recordable film (4), the surface film (2) and the film (4) comprising a succession of microgrooves and/or pits (7) representing a pre-formatting signal, the walls (8) of said pits and/or microgrooves (7) being formed in each of films (2) and (4) of the material constituting said film. The invention is useful for making magnetic, magneto-optical and phase transition optical discs, used particularly in the field of computers.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G11B 7/26; G11B 5/84; G11B 7/007; G11B 7/013; G11B 11/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G11B 5/00 (2006.01); G11B 7/007 (2006.01); G11B 7/26 (2006.01); G11B 7/09 (2006.01); G11B 11/105 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G11B 7/261 (2013.01); G11B 5/00 (2013.01); G11B 7/00745 (2013.01); G11B 7/0938 (2013.01); G11B 11/10578 (2013.01); Y10S 428/90 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0008643A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0008643 A1 20000217; EP 1103047 A1 20010530; US 6620480 B1 20030916

INPADOC legal status


2006-01-25 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050628

2005-03-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050215

2003-07-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: OTB GROUP B.V.

2002-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: OTB GROUP B.V.

2001-05-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010227

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI NL SE