Global Patent Index - EP 1103048 A1

EP 1103048 A1 2001-05-30 - COMPACT DISC SHAPED LIKE A CALLING CARD

Title (en)

COMPACT DISC SHAPED LIKE A CALLING CARD

Title (de)

VISITENKARTENFÖRMIGE COMPACT DISC

Title (fr)

DISQUE COMPACT SOUS FORME DE CARTE DE VISITE

Publication

EP 1103048 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98942811 A

Priority

  • FR 9801880 W
  • FR 9810071 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2782187A1] The invention concerns a compact disc consisting of a support (210) treated on one surface for receiving a film for storing data arranged in the form of a circular ring (220) of digital data to be read by a compact disc player (100) comprising a removable drawer (110) provided in its base, a first circular cavity (120) having depth and diameter substantially greater than those of the disc so as to receive, position and wedge the selected disc. Said compact disc is characterised in that its support (210) adopts the shape of a rectangular calling card comprising a film for storing data in the form of a circular ring (220) whereof the outer circle is inscribed in said rectangle and means for positioning and wedging (230) said rectangular support in the drawer (110) of the player (100), and more particularly in the second circular cavity (130) designed to receive, position and wedge compact discs of smaller dimensions.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G11B 25/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G11B 7/24 (2006.01); G11B 7/0037 (2006.01); G11B 17/056 (2006.01); G11B 25/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G11B 23/0014 (2013.01); G06K 19/044 (2013.01); G11B 17/056 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0008646A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2782187 A1 20000211; AU 9080498 A 20000228; BR 9815981 A 20011009; CA 2339874 A1 20000217; CN 1309808 A 20010822; EP 1103048 A1 20010530; IL 141255 D0 20020310; JP 2002522862 A 20020723; WO 0008646 A1 20000217

INPADOC legal status


2009-11-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031028

2008-04-18 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1038092

2004-05-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CHOURAQUI, JEAN

2004-05-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FORGUES, MICHEL

2004-05-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CHOURAQUI, JEAN

2004-05-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: FORGUES, MICHEL

2004-01-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FORGUES, MICHEL

2004-01-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CHOURAQUI, JEAN

2004-01-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: FORGUES, MICHEL

2004-01-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CHOURAQUI, JEAN

2002-03-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020130

2001-05-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010302

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE