Global Patent Index - EP 1103088 A1

EP 1103088 A1 2001-05-30 - BUSHING CONTACT

Title (en)

BUSHING CONTACT

Title (de)

BUCHSENKONTAKT

Title (fr)

CONTACT DE DOUILLE

Publication

EP 1103088 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99945871 A

Priority

  • DE 9902015 W
  • DE 19835020 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0008721A1] The invention relates to a bushing contact (1) comprising an upper spring (3) and a base spring (2), the upper spring enclosing the base spring in a box-like manner with a first wall (11), a second wall (12), a third wall (13) and a fourth divided wall. The wall sections (14a, 14b) of the fourth divided wall are connected to each other in a positive fitting manner. At least two assembling tabs (23) are formed in the front region and rear region of a wall section (14a), in the plugging direction of said bushing contact (1). On the other wall section (14b), recesses (24) for said respective assembling tabs (23) are formed, whereby said tabs can pass through said recesses and be bent back. The two wall sections (14a, 14b) overlap over the whole length of the upper spring (3) in such a way that stability is improved.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/11 (2006.01); H01R 13/15 (2006.01); H01R 13/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/18 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0008721A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0008721 A1 20000217; DE 19835020 A1 20000406; DE 19835020 C2 20010208; EP 1103088 A1 20010530; EP 1103088 B1 20020925; JP 2002522883 A 20020723; US 6872103 B1 20050329

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170727

- Year of fee payment: 19

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070701

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060731

2007-05-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070330

2007-03-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060701

2006-07-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060731

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-07-01 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060701

2005-07-18 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050718

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-06-22 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050622

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-09-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030626

2003-07-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 1103088E

2003-03-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-02-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030127

2002-10-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59902874 20021031

2002-10-16 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-09-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-01-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011128

2001-05-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001205

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE